House | 09/19/2024 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 09/19/2024 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 09/19/2024 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 09/18/2024 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S6182-6184) | ||
Senate | 09/18/2024 | S.Amdt.3288 Amendment SA 3288 proposed by Senator Hassan for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S6185) | ||
Senate | 09/18/2024 | S.Amdt.3288 Amendment SA 3288 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | ||
Senate | 09/18/2024 | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S6185) | ||
Senate | 09/18/2024 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6184-6185) | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 196. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2023 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-93. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |