Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1892 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 07/05/2023

                            II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 1892 
To provide for the closure and disposal of the Pueblo Chemical Depot, 
Pueblo County, Colorado. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
JUNE8, 2023 
Mr. H
ICKENLOOPER(for himself and Mr. BENNET) introduced the following 
bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services 
A BILL 
To provide for the closure and disposal of the Pueblo 
Chemical Depot, Pueblo County, Colorado. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Promoting Utilization 4
and Economic Benefits from Land Optimization (PUEB-5
LO) Act’’. 6
SEC. 2. CLOSURE AND DISPOSAL OF THE PUEBLO CHEM-7
ICAL DEPOT, PUEBLO COUNTY, COLORADO. 8
(a) I
NGENERAL.—The Secretary of the Army shall 9
close the Pueblo Chemical Depot in Pueblo County, Colo-10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:06 Jul 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1892.IS S1892
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•S 1892 IS
rado (in this section referred to as the ‘‘Depot’’), not later 1
than one year after the completion of the chemical demili-2
tarization mission at such location in accordance with the 3
Convention on the Prohibition of the Development, Pro-4
duction, Stockpiling and Use of Chemical Weapons and 5
on their Destruction, done at Geneva September 3, 1992, 6
and entered into force April 29, 1997 (commonly referred 7
to as the ‘‘Chemical Weapons Convention’’). 8
(b) P
ROCEDURES.—The Secretary of the Army shall 9
carry out the closure and subsequent related property 10
management and disposal of the Depot, including the 11
land, buildings, structures, infrastructure, and associated 12
equipment, installed equipment, material, and personal 13
property that comprise the Chemical Agent-Destruction 14
Pilot Plant, in accordance with the procedures and au-15
thorities for the closure, management, and disposal of 16
property under the Defense Base Closure and Realign-17
ment Act of 1990 (part A of title XXIX of Public Law 18
101–510; 10 U.S.C. 2687 note). 19
(c) O
FFICE OFLOCALDEFENSECOMMUNITYCO-20
OPERATIONACTIVITIES.—The Office of Local Defense 21
Community Cooperation of the Department of Defense 22
may make grants and supplement other Federal funds 23
pursuant to section 2391 of title 10, United States Code, 24
to support closure and reuse activities of the Depot. 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:06 Jul 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1892.IS S1892
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•S 1892 IS
(d) TREATMENT OFEXISTINGPERMITS.—Nothing in 1
this section shall be construed to prevent the removal or 2
demolition by the Program Executive Office, Assembled 3
Chemical Weapons Alternatives of the Department of the 4
Army of existing buildings, structures, infrastructure, and 5
associated equipment, installed equipment, material, and 6
personal property of the Chemical Agent-Destruction Pilot 7
Plant at the Depot in accordance with Hazardous Waste 8
Permit Number CO–20–09–02–01 under the Solid Waste 9
Disposal Act (42 U.S.C. 6901 et seq.) (commonly known 10
as the ‘‘Resource Conservation and Recovery Act of 11
1976’’) issued by the State of Colorado, or any associated 12
or follow-on permits under such Act. 13
(e) H
OMELESSUSE.—Given the nature of activities 14
undertaken at the Chemical Agent-Destruction Pilot Plant 15
at the Depot, such land, buildings, structures, infrastruc-16
ture, and associated equipment, installed equipment, ma-17
terial, and personal property comprising the Chemical 18
Agent-Destruction Pilot Plant is deemed unsuitable for 19
homeless use and, in carrying out any closure, manage-20
ment, or disposal of property under this section, need not 21
be screened for homeless use purposes pursuant to section 22
2905(b)(7) of the Defense Base Closure and Realignment 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:06 Jul 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1892.IS S1892
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 
•S 1892 IS
Act of 1990 (part A of title XXIX of Public Law 101– 1
510; 10 U.S.C. 2687 note). 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:06 Jul 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1892.IS S1892
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS