House | 06/21/2024 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 06/21/2024 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | S.Amdt.2074 Amendment SA 2074 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | S.Amdt.2074 Amendment SA 2074 proposed by Senator Tester. (consideration: CR S4172) In the nature of a substitute. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S4188-4198) | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4172) | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. | ||
Senate | 07/19/2023 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2023 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-120. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |