Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB208 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/15/2023

                            II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 208 
To establish a procedure for terminating a determination by Surgeon General 
to suspend certain entries and imports from designated places. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY1, 2023 
Mr. L
ANKFORD(for himself, Ms. SINEMA, Mr. KELLY, Mr. THUNE, Mr. 
M
ANCHIN, Mrs. CAPITO, Mr. TESTER, Ms. HASSAN, and Mr. TILLIS) in-
troduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Com-
mittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions 
A BILL 
To establish a procedure for terminating a determination 
by Surgeon General to suspend certain entries and im-
ports from designated places. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Public Health and Bor-4
der Security Act of 2023’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:15 Feb 11, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S208.IS S208
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 208 IS
SEC. 2. TERMINATION OF SUSPENSION OF ENTRIES AND 1
IMPORTS FROM DESIGNATED PLACES RE-2
LATED TO THE COVID–19 PANDEMIC. 3
(a) I
NGENERAL.—An order of suspension issued 4
under section 362 of the Public Health Service Act (42 5
U.S.C. 265) as a result of the public health emergency 6
relating to the Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID–19) 7
pandemic declared under section 319 of such Act (42 8
U.S.C. 247d) on January 31, 2020, and any continuation 9
of such declaration (including the continuation described 10
in Proclamation 9994 on February 24, 2021), shall be lift-11
ed not earlier than 60 days after the date on which the 12
Surgeon General provides written notification to the ap-13
propriate authorizing and appropriating committees of 14
Congress that such public health emergency declaration 15
(including the continuation described in Proclamation 16
9994 on February 24, 2021) have been terminated. 17
(b) P
ROCEDURES DURING60-DAYTERMINATION 18
W
INDOW.— 19
(1) P
LAN.—Not later than 30 days after the 20
date on which a written notification is provided 21
under subsection (a) with respect to an order of sus-22
pension, the Surgeon General, in consultation with 23
the Secretary of Homeland Security, and the head of 24
any other Federal agency, State, local or Tribal gov-25
ernment, or nongovernmental organization that has 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:15 Feb 11, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S208.IS S208
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•S 208 IS
a role in managing outcomes associated with the 1
suspension, as determined by the Surgeon General 2
(or the designee of the Surgeon General), shall de-3
velop and submit to the appropriate committees of 4
Congress, a plan to address any possible influx of 5
entries or imports, as defined in such order of sus-6
pension, related to the termination of such order. 7
(2) F
AILURE TO SUBMIT .—If a plan under 8
paragraph (1) is not submitted to the appropriate 9
committees of Congress within the 30-day period de-10
scribed in such paragraph, not later than 7 days 11
after the expiration of such 30-day period, the Sec-12
retary shall notify the appropriate committees of 13
Congress, in writing, of the status of preparing such 14
a plan and the timing for submission as required 15
under paragraph (1). The termination of order re-16
lated to such plan shall be delayed until that date 17
that is 30 days after the date on which such plan 18
is submitted to such committees. 19
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 05:15 Feb 11, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S208.IS S208
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB