Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB2339 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/08/2023

                            II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 2339 
To extend the prohibition on certain reductions to the B–1 bomber aircraft 
squadrons. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
JULY18, 2023 
Mr. C
RUZintroduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to 
the Committee on Armed Services 
A BILL 
To extend the prohibition on certain reductions to the B– 
1 bomber aircraft squadrons. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. EXTENSION OF PROHIBITION ON CERTAIN RE-3
DUCTIONS TO B–1 BOMBER AIRCRAFT 4
SQUADRONS. 5
Section 133(c)(1) of the National Defense Authoriza-6
tion Act for Fiscal Year 2022 (Public Law 117–81; 135 7
Stat. 1574) is amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ 8
and inserting ‘‘September 30, 2026’’. 9
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:51 Aug 04, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S2339.IS S2339
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS