Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB3141 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 118THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 3141
55 To provide for the consideration of a definition of antisemitism set forth
66 by the International Holocaust Remembrance Alliance for the enforce-
77 ment of Federal antidiscrimination laws concerning education programs
88 or activities, and for other purposes.
99 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
1010 OCTOBER26, 2023
1111 Mrs. B
1212 RITT(for Mr. SCOTTof South Carolina (for himself, Mr. RICKETTS,
1313 Mrs. B
1414 RITT, Mr. HAWLEY, Mr. SCOTTof Florida, and Mr. BOOZMAN))
1515 introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the
1616 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
1717 A BILL
1818 To provide for the consideration of a definition of anti-
1919 semitism set forth by the International Holocaust Re-
2020 membrance Alliance for the enforcement of Federal anti-
2121 discrimination laws concerning education programs or
2222 activities, and for other purposes.
2323 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
2424 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2525 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2626 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Antisemitism Aware-4
2727 ness Act of 2023’’. 5
2828 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141 2
2929 •S 3141 IS
3030 SEC. 2. SENSE OF CONGRESS. 1
3131 It is the sense of Congress that— 2
3232 (1) title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (42 3
3333 U.S.C. 2000d et seq.), prohibits discrimination on 4
3434 the basis of race, color, and national origin in pro-5
3535 grams and activities receiving Federal financial as-6
3636 sistance; 7
3737 (2) while such title does not cover discrimina-8
3838 tion based solely on religion, individuals who face 9
3939 discrimination based on actual or perceived shared 10
4040 ancestry or ethnic characteristics do not lose protec-11
4141 tion under such title for also being members of a 12
4242 group that share a common religion; 13
4343 (3) discrimination against Jews may give rise to 14
4444 a violation of such title when the discrimination is 15
4545 based on race, color, or national origin, which can 16
4646 include discrimination based on actual or perceived 17
4747 shared ancestry or ethnic characteristics; 18
4848 (4) it is the policy of the United States to en-19
4949 force such title against prohibited forms of discrimi-20
5050 nation rooted in antisemitism as vigorously as 21
5151 against all other forms of discrimination prohibited 22
5252 by such title; and 23
5353 (5) as noted in the U.S. National Strategy to 24
5454 Counter Antisemitism issued by the White House on 25
5555 May 25, 2023, it is critical to— 26
5656 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141 3
5757 •S 3141 IS
5858 (A) increase awareness and understanding 1
5959 of antisemitism, including its threat to America; 2
6060 (B) improve safety and security for Jewish 3
6161 communities; 4
6262 (C) reverse the normalization of anti-5
6363 semitism and counter antisemitic discrimina-6
6464 tion; and 7
6565 (D) expand communication and collabora-8
6666 tion between communities. 9
6767 SEC. 3. FINDINGS. 10
6868 Congress finds the following: 11
6969 (1) Antisemitism is on the rise in the United 12
7070 States and is impacting Jewish students in K–12 13
7171 schools, colleges, and universities. 14
7272 (2) The International Holocaust Remembrance 15
7373 Alliance (referred to in this Act as the ‘‘IHRA’’) 16
7474 Working Definition of Antisemitism is a vital tool 17
7575 which helps individuals understand and identify the 18
7676 various manifestations of antisemitism. 19
7777 (3) On December 11, 2019, Executive Order 20
7878 13899 extended protections against discrimination 21
7979 under the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to individuals 22
8080 subjected to antisemitism on college and university 23
8181 campuses and tasked Federal agencies to consider 24
8282 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141 4
8383 •S 3141 IS
8484 the IHRA Working Definition of Antisemitism when 1
8585 enforcing title VI of such Act. 2
8686 (4) Since 2018, the Department of Education 3
8787 has used the IHRA Working Definition of Anti-4
8888 semitism when investigating violations of that title 5
8989 VI. 6
9090 (5) The use of alternative definitions of anti-7
9191 semitism impairs enforcement efforts by adding mul-8
9292 tiple standards and may fail to identify many of the 9
9393 modern manifestations of antisemitism. 10
9494 (6) The White House released the first-ever 11
9595 United States National Strategy to Counter Anti-12
9696 semitism on May 25, 2023, making clear that the 13
9797 fight against this hate is a national, bipartisan pri-14
9898 ority that must be successfully conducted through a 15
9999 whole-of-government-and-society approach. 16
100100 SEC. 4. DEFINITIONS. 17
101101 For purposes of this Act, the term ‘‘definition of anti-18
102102 semitism’’— 19
103103 (1) means the definition of antisemitism adopt-20
104104 ed on May 26, 2016, by the IHRA, of which the 21
105105 United States is a member, which definition has 22
106106 been adopted by the Department of State; and 23
107107 (2) includes the ‘‘[c]ontemporary examples of 24
108108 antisemitism’’ identified in the IHRA definition. 25
109109 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141 5
110110 •S 3141 IS
111111 SEC. 5. RULE OF CONSTRUCTION FOR TITLE VI OF THE 1
112112 CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964. 2
113113 In reviewing, investigating, or deciding whether there 3
114114 has been a violation of title VI of the Civil Rights Act 4
115115 of 1964 (42 U.S.C. 2000d et seq.) on the basis of race, 5
116116 color, or national origin, based on an individual’s actual 6
117117 or perceived shared Jewish ancestry or Jewish ethnic char-7
118118 acteristics, the Department of Education shall take into 8
119119 consideration the definition of antisemitism as part of the 9
120120 Department’s assessment of whether the practice was mo-10
121121 tivated by antisemitic intent. 11
122122 SEC. 6. OTHER RULES OF CONSTRUCTION. 12
123123 (a) G
124124 ENERALRULE OFCONSTRUCTION.—Nothing in 13
125125 this Act shall be construed— 14
126126 (1) to expand the authority of the Secretary of 15
127127 Education; 16
128128 (2) to alter the standards pursuant to which the 17
129129 Department of Education makes a determination 18
130130 that harassing conduct amounts to actionable dis-19
131131 crimination; or 20
132132 (3) to diminish or infringe upon the rights pro-21
133133 tected under any other provision of law that is in ef-22
134134 fect as of the date of enactment of this Act. 23
135135 (b) C
136136 ONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS.—Nothing in 24
137137 this Act shall be construed to diminish or infringe upon 25
138138 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141 6
139139 •S 3141 IS
140140 any right protected under the First Amendment to the 1
141141 Constitution of the United States. 2
142142 Æ
143143 VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:13 Oct 27, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S3141.IS S3141