1 | 1 | | II |
---|
2 | 2 | | 118THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION S. 3155 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand the denial of |
---|
6 | 6 | | deduction for certain excessive employee remuneration, and for other purposes. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES |
---|
8 | 8 | | OCTOBER26, 2023 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. R |
---|
10 | 10 | | EED(for himself, Mr. BLUMENTHAL, Mr. WHITEHOUSE, Ms. BALDWIN, |
---|
11 | 11 | | Ms. W |
---|
12 | 12 | | ARREN, Mr. MERKLEY, Mr. VANHOLLEN, and Mr. SANDERS) in- |
---|
13 | 13 | | troduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Com- |
---|
14 | 14 | | mittee on Finance |
---|
15 | 15 | | A BILL |
---|
16 | 16 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand |
---|
17 | 17 | | the denial of deduction for certain excessive employee |
---|
18 | 18 | | remuneration, and for other purposes. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
20 | 20 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
22 | 22 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Stop Subsidizing Mul-4 |
---|
23 | 23 | | timillion Dollar Corporate Bonuses Act’’. 5 |
---|
24 | 24 | | SEC. 2. EXPANSION OF DENIAL OF DEDUCTION FOR CER-6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | TAIN EXCESSIVE EMPLOYEE REMUNERA-7 |
---|
26 | 26 | | TION. 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) I |
---|
28 | 28 | | NGENERAL.— 9 |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:39 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3155.IS S3155 |
---|
30 | 30 | | ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •S 3155 IS |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) EXPANSION.—Section 162(m) of the Inter-1 |
---|
33 | 33 | | nal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended— 2 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (A) by striking ‘‘applicable employee remu-3 |
---|
35 | 35 | | neration’’ each place it appears in paragraphs 4 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1), (4), and (5)(E) and inserting ‘‘applicable 5 |
---|
37 | 37 | | remuneration’’, 6 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (B) by striking ‘‘covered employee’’ each 7 |
---|
39 | 39 | | place it appears in paragraphs (1) and (4) and 8 |
---|
40 | 40 | | inserting ‘‘covered individual’’, and 9 |
---|
41 | 41 | | (C) by striking ‘‘employee’’ each place it 10 |
---|
42 | 42 | | appears in paragraph (1) and subparagraphs 11 |
---|
43 | 43 | | (A), (C)(ii), and (E) of paragraph (4) and in-12 |
---|
44 | 44 | | serting ‘‘individual’’. 13 |
---|
45 | 45 | | (2) C |
---|
46 | 46 | | OVERED INDIVIDUAL.—Paragraph (3) of 14 |
---|
47 | 47 | | section 162(m) of such Code is amended to read as 15 |
---|
48 | 48 | | follows: 16 |
---|
49 | 49 | | ‘‘(3) C |
---|
50 | 50 | | OVERED INDIVIDUAL.—For purposes of 17 |
---|
51 | 51 | | this subsection, the term ‘covered individual’ 18 |
---|
52 | 52 | | means— 19 |
---|
53 | 53 | | ‘‘(A) any individual who performs services 20 |
---|
54 | 54 | | (directly or indirectly) for the taxpayer (or any 21 |
---|
55 | 55 | | predecessor) for any taxable year beginning 22 |
---|
56 | 56 | | after December 31, 2022, or 23 |
---|
57 | 57 | | ‘‘(B) any employee— 24 |
---|
58 | 58 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:39 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3155.IS S3155 |
---|
59 | 59 | | ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
60 | 60 | | •S 3155 IS |
---|
61 | 61 | | ‘‘(i) who was the principal executive 1 |
---|
62 | 62 | | officer or principal financial officer of the 2 |
---|
63 | 63 | | taxpayer (or any predecessor) at any time 3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | during any preceding taxable year begin-4 |
---|
65 | 65 | | ning after December 31, 2016, and before 5 |
---|
66 | 66 | | January 1, 2023, or who was an individual 6 |
---|
67 | 67 | | acting in such a capacity, or 7 |
---|
68 | 68 | | ‘‘(ii) the total compensation of whom 8 |
---|
69 | 69 | | for any taxable year described in clause (i) 9 |
---|
70 | 70 | | was required to be reported to shareholders 10 |
---|
71 | 71 | | under the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 11 |
---|
72 | 72 | | by reason of such individual being among 12 |
---|
73 | 73 | | the 3 highest compensated officers for the 13 |
---|
74 | 74 | | taxable year (other than any individual de-14 |
---|
75 | 75 | | scribed in clause (i)). 15 |
---|
76 | 76 | | Such term shall include any employee who would be 16 |
---|
77 | 77 | | described in subparagraph (B)(ii) if the reporting 17 |
---|
78 | 78 | | described in such subparagraph were required as so 18 |
---|
79 | 79 | | described.’’. 19 |
---|
80 | 80 | | (3) C |
---|
81 | 81 | | ONFORMING AMENDMENTS .— 20 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (A) The heading for section 162(m) of the 21 |
---|
83 | 83 | | Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by 22 |
---|
84 | 84 | | striking ‘‘E |
---|
85 | 85 | | MPLOYEE’’. 23 |
---|
86 | 86 | | (B) The heading for section 162(m)(4) is 24 |
---|
87 | 87 | | amended by striking ‘‘ |
---|
88 | 88 | | EMPLOYEE’’. 25 |
---|
89 | 89 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:39 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3155.IS S3155 |
---|
90 | 90 | | ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 4 |
---|
91 | 91 | | •S 3155 IS |
---|
92 | 92 | | (b) MODIFICATION OF DEFINITION OFPUBLICLY 1 |
---|
93 | 93 | | H |
---|
94 | 94 | | ELDCORPORATION.—Section 162(m)(2) of the Internal 2 |
---|
95 | 95 | | Revenue Code of 1986 is amended— 3 |
---|
96 | 96 | | (1) by inserting ‘‘, with respect to any taxable 4 |
---|
97 | 97 | | year,’’ after ‘‘means’’, and 5 |
---|
98 | 98 | | (2) by striking subparagraph (B) and inserting 6 |
---|
99 | 99 | | the following: 7 |
---|
100 | 100 | | ‘‘(B) that was required to file reports 8 |
---|
101 | 101 | | under section 15(d) of such Act (15 U.S.C. 9 |
---|
102 | 102 | | 78o(d)) at any time during the 3-taxable year 10 |
---|
103 | 103 | | period ending with such taxable year.’’. 11 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (c) R |
---|
105 | 105 | | EGULATORYAUTHORITY.— 12 |
---|
106 | 106 | | (1) I |
---|
107 | 107 | | N GENERAL.—Section 162(m) of the Inter-13 |
---|
108 | 108 | | nal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by adding at 14 |
---|
109 | 109 | | the end the following new paragraph: 15 |
---|
110 | 110 | | ‘‘(7) R |
---|
111 | 111 | | EGULATIONS.—The Secretary may pre-16 |
---|
112 | 112 | | scribe such guidance, rules, or regulations as are 17 |
---|
113 | 113 | | necessary to carry out the purposes of this sub-18 |
---|
114 | 114 | | section, including regulations— 19 |
---|
115 | 115 | | ‘‘(A) with respect to reporting, and 20 |
---|
116 | 116 | | ‘‘(B) to prevent avoidance of the purposes 21 |
---|
117 | 117 | | of this section by providing compensation 22 |
---|
118 | 118 | | through a pass-through or other entity.’’. 23 |
---|
119 | 119 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:39 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S3155.IS S3155 |
---|
120 | 120 | | ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS 5 |
---|
121 | 121 | | •S 3155 IS |
---|
122 | 122 | | (2) CONFORMING AMENDMENT .—Paragraph (6) 1 |
---|
123 | 123 | | of section 162(m) of such Code is amended by strik-2 |
---|
124 | 124 | | ing subparagraph (H). 3 |
---|
125 | 125 | | (d) E |
---|
126 | 126 | | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 4 |
---|
127 | 127 | | this section shall apply to taxable years beginning after 5 |
---|
128 | 128 | | December 31, 2022. 6 |
---|
129 | 129 | | Æ |
---|
130 | 130 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 17:39 Oct 28, 2023 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S3155.IS S3155 |
---|
131 | 131 | | ssavage on DSKBC07HB2PROD with BILLS |
---|