Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB348 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 118THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 348
55 To require asylum officers at United States embassies and consulates to
66 conduct credible fear screenings before aliens seeking asylum may be
77 permitted to enter the United States to apply for asylum, and for
88 other purposes.
99 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
1010 FEBRUARY9, 2023
1111 Mrs. B
1212 RITT(for herself, Mr. BARRASSO, Mr. CASSIDY, Mr. COTTON, Mr.
1313 C
1414 RAPO, Mrs. HYDE-SMITH, Mr. MULLIN, Mr. RISCH, Mr. ROUNDS, Mr.
1515 T
1616 HUNE, Mr. TILLIS, and Mr. BOOZMAN) introduced the following bill;
1717 which was read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary
1818 A BILL
1919 To require asylum officers at United States embassies and
2020 consulates to conduct credible fear screenings before
2121 aliens seeking asylum may be permitted to enter the
2222 United States to apply for asylum, and for other pur-
2323 poses.
2424 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
2525 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2626 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2727 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Asylum Abuse Reduc-4
2828 tion Act’’. 5
2929 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
3030 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2
3131 •S 348 IS
3232 SEC. 2. ASYLUM INTERVIEWS. 1
3333 (a) B
3434 ORDERCROSSINGS.—Notwithstanding section 2
3535 235(b)(1) of the Immigration and Nationality Act (8 3
3636 U.S.C. 1225(b)(1)), if an alien who is seeking asylum in 4
3737 the United States attempts to enter the United States 5
3838 from Canada or Mexico at a land port of entry without 6
3939 a valid visa or other appropriate entry document, the im-7
4040 migration officer who is inspecting the alien— 8
4141 (1) may not admit or parole the alien into the 9
4242 United States; and 10
4343 (2) shall advise the alien to schedule an asylum 11
4444 hearing with the most convenient United States em-12
4545 bassy or consulate in Canada or Mexico. 13
4646 (b) C
4747 REDIBLEFEARSCREENINGS.—An alien de-14
4848 scribed in subsection (a) may only be permitted to enter 15
4949 the United States to apply for asylum if an asylum officer 16
5050 stationed at a United States embassy or consulate— 17
5151 (1) has conducted an in-person or telephonic 18
5252 interview with the alien; and 19
5353 (2) as a result of such interview, has concluded 20
5454 that the alien— 21
5555 (A)(i) has been persecuted in the alien’s 22
5656 country of nationality on account of the alien’s 23
5757 race, religion, nationality, membership in a par-24
5858 ticular social group, or political opinion; 25
5959 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
6060 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3
6161 •S 348 IS
6262 (ii) has a credible fear of persecution (as 1
6363 defined in section 235(b)(1)(B) of the Immigra-2
6464 tion and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 3
6565 1225(b)(1)(B))) if the alien returned to such 4
6666 country; or 5
6767 (iii) would be subject to torture by a gov-6
6868 ernment or public official acting under the color 7
6969 of law if the alien returned to his or her coun-8
7070 try of nationality; and 9
7171 (B) is otherwise eligible for asylum under 10
7272 section 208(a) of that Act (8 U.S.C. 1158(a)). 11
7373 SEC. 3. ASYLUM INELIGIBILITY. 12
7474 Section 208(a)(2) of the Immigration and Nationality 13
7575 Act (8 U.S.C. 1158(a)(2)) is amended by adding at the 14
7676 end the following: 15
7777 ‘‘(F) T
7878 RANSIT THROUGH THIRD COUN -16
7979 TRY.— 17
8080 ‘‘(i) I
8181 N GENERAL.—Except as pro-18
8282 vided in clause (ii), paragraph (1) shall not 19
8383 apply to any alien who, on or after the 20
8484 date of the enactment of this subpara-21
8585 graph, enters, attempts to enter, or arrives 22
8686 in the United States through the Southern 23
8787 land border after transiting through, on 24
8888 the way to the United States, one or more 25
8989 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
9090 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4
9191 •S 348 IS
9292 countries other than the country of citizen-1
9393 ship, nationality, or last lawful habitual 2
9494 residence of the alien. 3
9595 ‘‘(ii) E
9696 XCEPTIONS.—Clause (i) shall 4
9797 not apply if— 5
9898 ‘‘(I)(aa) the alien demonstrates 6
9999 that he or she applied for protection 7
100100 from persecution or torture in one or 8
101101 more countries (other than the coun-9
102102 try of citizenship, nationality, or last 10
103103 lawful habitual residence of the alien) 11
104104 through which the alien transited on 12
105105 the way to the United States; and 13
106106 ‘‘(bb) the alien received a final 14
107107 judgment denying the alien protection 15
108108 in such country; 16
109109 ‘‘(II) the alien demonstrates that 17
110110 he or she is or has been subject to a 18
111111 severe form of trafficking in persons; 19
112112 or 20
113113 ‘‘(III) the one or more countries 21
114114 through which the alien transited on 22
115115 the way to the United States were 23
116116 not, at the time of the transit, parties 24
117117 to— 25
118118 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
119119 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 5
120120 •S 348 IS
121121 ‘‘(aa) the Convention Relat-1
122122 ing to the Status of Refugees, 2
123123 done at Geneva July 28, 1951 3
124124 (as made applicable by the Pro-4
125125 tocol Relating to the Status of 5
126126 Refugees, done at New York 6
127127 January 31, 1967 (19 UST 7
128128 6223)); or 8
129129 ‘‘(bb) the Convention 9
130130 against Torture and Other Cruel, 10
131131 Inhuman or Degrading Treat-11
132132 ment or Punishment, done at 12
133133 New York December 10, 1984. 13
134134 ‘‘(G) I
135135 NTERNAL RELOCATION .—Paragraph 14
136136 (1) shall not apply to an alien interviewed by an 15
137137 asylum officer under section 2(b) of the Asylum 16
138138 Abuse Reduction Act if the asylum officer 17
139139 makes a determination that the alien may avoid 18
140140 purported persecution or torture in the alien’s 19
141141 country of nationality by relocating to another 20
142142 part of such country.’’. 21
143143 SEC. 4. CRIMINAL BENCH WARRANTS. 22
144144 (a) I
145145 SSUANCE.—Each Federal judicial district shall 23
146146 appoint at least 1 magistrate or district court judge who, 24
147147 upon a showing of probable cause, shall issue a warrant 25
148148 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
149149 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 6
150150 •S 348 IS
151151 of arrest for a violation of section 243(a)(1) of the Immi-1
152152 gration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1253(a)(1)). 2
153153 (b) P
154154 ROBABLECAUSE.—An order of removal issued 3
155155 under any provision of the Immigration and Nationality 4
156156 Act (8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq.) that has been in existence 5
157157 90 days or more shall constitute prima facie evidence of 6
158158 probable cause to issue a warrant under subsection (a). 7
159159 SEC. 5. INAPPLICABILITY OF FLORES SETTLEMENT AGREE-8
160160 MENT TO ALIENS SUBJECT TO DETENTION. 9
161161 The stipulated settlement agreement filed in the 10
162162 United States District Court for the Central District of 11
163163 California on January 17, 1997 (CV 85–4544–RJK) 12
164164 (commonly known as the ‘‘Flores settlement agreement’’), 13
165165 shall not apply to the detention and custody of aliens sub-14
166166 ject to detention in the United States under the Immigra-15
167167 tion and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq.). 16
168168 Æ
169169 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:04 Feb 23, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S348.IS S348
170170 kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS