House | 06/27/2023 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 06/27/2023 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2251; text: CR S2252) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment. With written report No. 118-14. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |