Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB4127 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 118THCONGRESS
33 2
44 DSESSION S. 4127
55 To provide for the consideration of a definition of antisemitism set forth
66 by the International Holocaust Remembrance Alliance for the enforce-
77 ment of Federal antidiscrimination laws concerning education programs
88 or activities, and for other purposes.
99 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
1010 APRIL16, 2024
1111 Mr. S
1212 COTTof South Carolina (for himself, Mr. CASEY, Mr. LANKFORD, Ms.
1313 R
1414 OSEN, Mr. SCOTTof Florida, Mr. WYDEN, Mr. MORAN, Mr. BENNET,
1515 Mr. B
1616 OOZMAN, Ms. CORTEZMASTO, Ms. COLLINS, Mr. COONS, Mr.
1717 C
1818 RAPO, Ms. SINEMA, Mr. GRASSLEY, Mrs. GILLIBRAND, Mr. HAWLEY,
1919 Mr. H
2020 ICKENLOOPER, Mrs. BRITT, Mr. BLUMENTHAL, Mr. RICKETTS,
2121 Mr. F
2222 ETTERMAN, Mr. BARRASSO, Mr. CARDIN, Mr. COTTON, Mr.
2323 M
2424 ANCHIN, Mr. CORNYN, Ms. HASSAN, Mrs. CAPITO, and Ms. CANTWELL)
2525 introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the
2626 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
2727 A BILL
2828 To provide for the consideration of a definition of anti-
2929 semitism set forth by the International Holocaust Re-
3030 membrance Alliance for the enforcement of Federal anti-
3131 discrimination laws concerning education programs or
3232 activities, and for other purposes.
3333 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
3434 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
3535 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
3636 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2
3737 •S 4127 IS
3838 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 1
3939 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Antisemitism Aware-2
4040 ness Act of 2024’’. 3
4141 SEC. 2. SENSE OF CONGRESS. 4
4242 It is the sense of Congress that— 5
4343 (1) title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (42 6
4444 U.S.C. 2000d et seq.), prohibits discrimination on 7
4545 the basis of race, color, and national origin in pro-8
4646 grams and activities receiving Federal financial as-9
4747 sistance; 10
4848 (2) while such title does not cover discrimina-11
4949 tion based solely on religion, individuals who face 12
5050 discrimination based on actual or perceived shared 13
5151 ancestry or ethnic characteristics do not lose protec-14
5252 tion under such title for also being members of a 15
5353 group that share a common religion; 16
5454 (3) discrimination against Jews may give rise to 17
5555 a violation of such title when the discrimination is 18
5656 based on race, color, or national origin, which can 19
5757 include discrimination based on actual or perceived 20
5858 shared ancestry or ethnic characteristics; 21
5959 (4) it is the policy of the United States to en-22
6060 force such title against prohibited forms of discrimi-23
6161 nation rooted in antisemitism as vigorously as 24
6262 against all other forms of discrimination prohibited 25
6363 by such title; and 26
6464 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
6565 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3
6666 •S 4127 IS
6767 (5) as noted in the U.S. National Strategy to 1
6868 Counter Antisemitism issued by the White House on 2
6969 May 25, 2023, it is critical to— 3
7070 (A) increase awareness and understanding 4
7171 of antisemitism, including its threat to America; 5
7272 (B) improve safety and security for Jewish 6
7373 communities; 7
7474 (C) reverse the normalization of anti-8
7575 semitism and counter antisemitic discrimina-9
7676 tion; and 10
7777 (D) expand communication and collabora-11
7878 tion between communities. 12
7979 SEC. 3. FINDINGS. 13
8080 Congress finds the following: 14
8181 (1) Antisemitism is on the rise in the United 15
8282 States and is impacting Jewish students in K–12 16
8383 schools, colleges, and universities. 17
8484 (2) The International Holocaust Remembrance 18
8585 Alliance (referred to in this Act as the ‘‘IHRA’’) 19
8686 Working Definition of Antisemitism is a vital tool 20
8787 which helps individuals understand and identify the 21
8888 various manifestations of antisemitism. 22
8989 (3) On December 11, 2019, Executive Order 23
9090 13899 extended protections against discrimination 24
9191 under the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to individuals 25
9292 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
9393 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4
9494 •S 4127 IS
9595 subjected to antisemitism on college and university 1
9696 campuses and tasked Federal agencies to consider 2
9797 the IHRA Working Definition of Antisemitism when 3
9898 enforcing title VI of such Act. 4
9999 (4) Since 2018, the Department of Education 5
100100 has used the IHRA Working Definition of Anti-6
101101 semitism when investigating violations of that title 7
102102 VI. 8
103103 (5) The White House released the first-ever 9
104104 United States National Strategy to Counter Anti-10
105105 semitism on May 25, 2023, making clear that the 11
106106 fight against this hate is a national, bipartisan pri-12
107107 ority that must be successfully conducted through a 13
108108 whole-of-government-and-society approach. 14
109109 SEC. 4. DEFINITIONS. 15
110110 For purposes of this Act, the term ‘‘definition of anti-16
111111 semitism’’— 17
112112 (1) means the definition of antisemitism adopt-18
113113 ed on May 26, 2016, by the IHRA, of which the 19
114114 United States is a member, which definition has 20
115115 been adopted by the Department of State; and 21
116116 (2) includes the ‘‘[c]ontemporary examples of 22
117117 antisemitism’’ identified in the IHRA definition. 23
118118 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
119119 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5
120120 •S 4127 IS
121121 SEC. 5. RULE OF CONSTRUCTION FOR TITLE VI OF THE 1
122122 CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964. 2
123123 In reviewing, investigating, or deciding whether there 3
124124 has been a violation of title VI of the Civil Rights Act 4
125125 of 1964 (42 U.S.C. 2000d et seq.) on the basis of race, 5
126126 color, or national origin, based on an individual’s actual 6
127127 or perceived shared Jewish ancestry or Jewish ethnic char-7
128128 acteristics, the Department of Education shall take into 8
129129 consideration the definition of antisemitism as part of the 9
130130 Department’s assessment of whether the practice was mo-10
131131 tivated by antisemitic intent. 11
132132 SEC. 6. OTHER RULES OF CONSTRUCTION. 12
133133 (a) G
134134 ENERALRULE OFCONSTRUCTION.—Nothing in 13
135135 this Act shall be construed— 14
136136 (1) to expand the authority of the Secretary of 15
137137 Education; 16
138138 (2) to alter the standards pursuant to which the 17
139139 Department of Education makes a determination 18
140140 that harassing conduct amounts to actionable dis-19
141141 crimination; or 20
142142 (3) to diminish or infringe upon the rights pro-21
143143 tected under any other provision of law that is in ef-22
144144 fect as of the date of enactment of this Act. 23
145145 (b) C
146146 ONSTITUTIONAL PROTECTIONS.—Nothing in 24
147147 this Act shall be construed to diminish or infringe upon 25
148148 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
149149 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 6
150150 •S 4127 IS
151151 any right protected under the First Amendment to the 1
152152 Constitution of the United States. 2
153153 Æ
154154 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:39 Apr 26, 2024 Jkt 049200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S4127.IS S4127
155155 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS