Senate | 07/30/2024 | Became Public Law No: 118-78. | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Signed by President. | ||
Senate | 07/25/2024 | Presented to President. | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4656-4657) | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4548. | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4656-4658) | ||
House | 07/22/2024 | Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Held at the desk. | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Received in the House. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4096-4097; text: CR S4096-4097) |