Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB455 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2023

                            II 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 455 
To terminate the requirement imposed by the Director of the Centers for 
Disease Control and Prevention for proof of COVID–19 vaccination for 
foreign travelers, and for other purposes. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY15, 2023 
Mr. M
ARSHALL(for himself, Mr. CRAMER, Mr. LEE, and Mr. BRAUN) intro-
duced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Com-
mittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions 
A BILL 
To terminate the requirement imposed by the Director of 
the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for proof 
of COVID–19 vaccination for foreign travelers, and for 
other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Travel Freedom Act’’. 4
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:31 Mar 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S455.IS S455
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 2 
•S 455 IS
SEC. 2. TERMINATING CDC REQUIREMENT FOR PROOF OF 1
COVID–19 VACCINATION FOR FOREIGN TRAV-2
ELERS. 3
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Beginning on the date of the en-4
actment of this Act, the air travel vaccination requirement 5
for foreign travelers shall have no force or effect. 6
(b) P
ROHIBITION ONFUNDING.—Beginning on the 7
date of the enactment of this Act, no Federal funds may 8
be used to administer, implement, or enforce the air travel 9
vaccination requirement for foreign travelers. 10
(c) A
IRTRAVELVACCINATIONREQUIREMENT FOR 11
F
OREIGNTRAVELERS.—In this section, the term ‘‘air 12
travel vaccination requirement for foreign travelers’’ refers 13
to the requirement specified in— 14
(1) the order issued by the Director of the Cen-15
ters for Disease Control and Prevention entitled 16
‘‘Amended Order Implementing Presidential Procla-17
mation on Advancing the Safe Resumption of Global 18
Travel During the COVID–19 Pandemic’’ and pub-19
lished in the Federal Register on April 7, 2022 (87 20
Fed. Reg. 20405 et seq.) for proof of COVID–19 21
vaccination for air travelers who are covered individ-22
uals (as defined in such order); or 23
(2) any successor or subsequent order of the 24
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention requir-25
ing foreign persons traveling by air to show proof of 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:31 Mar 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S455.IS S455
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 3 
•S 455 IS
COVID–19 vaccination as a condition on entering 1
the United States. 2
SEC. 3. TERMINATING REQUIREMENT FOR PROOF OF 3
COVID–19 VACCINATION FOR FOREIGN PER-4
SONS ENTERING ALONG UNITED STATES- 5
CANADA BORDER. 6
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Beginning on the date of the en-7
actment of this Act, the vaccination requirement for proc-8
essing foreign travelers entering at land points of entry, 9
including ferry terminals, along the United States-Canada 10
border shall have no force or effect. 11
(b) P
ROHIBITION ONFUNDING.—Beginning on the 12
date of the enactment of this Act, no Federal funds may 13
be used to administer, implement, or enforce the vaccina-14
tion requirement for processing foreign travelers entering 15
at land points of entry, including ferry terminals, along 16
the United States-Canada border. 17
(c) V
ACCINATIONREQUIREMENT FOR FOREIGN 18
T
RAVELERSENTERINGALONG THE UNITEDSTATES- 19
C
ANADABORDER.—In this section, the term ‘‘vaccination 20
requirement for processing foreign travelers entering at 21
land points of entry, including ferry terminals, along the 22
United States-Canada border’’ refers to the requirement 23
specified in— 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:31 Mar 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S455.IS S455
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS 4 
•S 455 IS
(1) the decision issued by the Secretary of 1
Homeland Security and the Commissioner for U.S. 2
Customs and Border Protection entitled ‘‘Notifica-3
tion of Temporary Travel Restrictions Applicable to 4
Land Ports of Entry and Ferries Service Between 5
the United States and Canada’’ and published in the 6
Federal Register on April 22, 2022 (87 Fed. Reg. 7
24048 et seq.) for proof of COVID–19 vaccination 8
for travelers who are covered individuals (as defined 9
in such order); or 10
(2) any successor or subsequent order of the 11
Secretary of Homeland Security or the Commis-12
sioner for U.S. Customs and Border Protection for 13
the processing for entry into the United States for-14
eign persons to show proof of COVID–19 vaccina-15
tion as a condition on entering the United States, 16
unless determined necessary by Congress. 17
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:31 Mar 03, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S455.IS S455
kjohnson on DSK79L0C42PROD with BILLS