Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Became Public Law No: 118-2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Signed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 419 - 0 (Roll no. 143). (text: CR H1255)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 619.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 140, H.J. Res. 27 and S. 619. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 140, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 27 and S. 619, under closed rules. General debate is limited to one hour of debate on all measures.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 199. (consideration: CR H1255-1260)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 199 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 199 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 140, H.J. Res. 27 and S. 619. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 140, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for consideration of H.J.Res. 27 and S. 619, under closed rules. General debate is limited to one hour of debate on all measures.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S612; text: CR S612)
|
|
|