Senate
|
10/01/2024
|
Became Public Law No: 118-98.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/01/2024
|
Signed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5594)
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 794.
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5594-5595)
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2024
|
Mr. Green (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
S.Amdt.934 Amendment SA 934 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S3118) To specify that no additional funds are authorized to be appropriated for the purpose of carrying out the Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
S.Amdt.934 Amendment SA 934 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3118; text: CR S3118)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|