Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 45. Record Vote Number: 243.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 45. Record Vote Number: 243.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S4740)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Vetoed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 209 (Roll no. 382). (text: CR H4052)
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 24.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and a motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24, under a closed rule with one hour of general debate for both joint resolutions and one motion to commit for both joint resolutions.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 614. (consideration: CR H4052-4058)
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 614 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 614 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and a motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24, under a closed rule with one hour of general debate for both joint resolutions and one motion to commit for both joint resolutions.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 49. Record Vote Number: 123. (text: CR S1614)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1609, S1613-1614)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 62.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
|
|
|