Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S66-67)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk. (text: CR S6048)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Vetoed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 202, 1 Present (Roll no. 690). (text: CR H6055)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 32.
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32.
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H6055-6062)
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 891 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5283, H.R. 5961 and S.J. Res. 32. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 44. Record Vote Number: 260. (consideration: CR S5055, S5061-5062; text: CR S5062)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 228.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged, by petition, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 802(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
|
|
|