Us Congress 2023-2024 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SJR6 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/02/2023

                            IIA 
118THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. J. RES. 6 
Disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council in approving 
the Local Resident Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2022. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY1, 2023 
Mr. C
RUZ(for himself, Mr. CORNYN, Mr. LANKFORD, Mr. TILLIS, Mr. SCOTT 
of Florida, Mr. V
ANCE, Mr. YOUNG, Mr. KENNEDY, Mr. HAWLEY, Mr. 
L
EE, and Mr. BUDD) introduced the following joint resolution; which was 
read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and 
Governmental Affairs 
JOINT RESOLUTION 
Disapproving the action of the District of Columbia Council 
in approving the Local Resident Voting Rights Amend-
ment Act of 2022. 
Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives1
of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
That the Congress disapproves of the action of the District 3
of Columbia Council described as follows: The Local Resi-4
dent Voting Rights Amendment Act of 2022 (D.C. Act 5
24–640), enacted by the District of Columbia Council on 6
November 21, 2022, and transmitted to Congress pursu-7
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:15 Feb 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SJ6.IS SJ6
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•SJ 6 IS 
ant to section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home 1
Rule Act on January 10, 2023. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:15 Feb 01, 2023 Jkt 039200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SJ6.IS SJ6
pbinns on DSKJLVW7X2PROD with $$_JOB