Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 46. Record Vote Number: 242.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Failed of passage in Senate over veto: Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 46. Record Vote Number: 242.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2023
|
Veto Message considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S4739-4740)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Veto message received in Senate. Ordered held at the desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Vetoed by President.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Presented to President.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 206 (Roll no. 381). (text: CR H4044)
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4051-4052)
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S. J. Res. 9, the Chair put the question on passage of the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S.J. Res. 9.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and a motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24, under a closed rule with one hour of general debate for both joint resolutions and one motion to commit for both joint resolutions.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 614. (consideration: CR H4044-4049)
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 614 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4366, under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and a motion to recommit. The resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 9 and S.J. Res. 24, under a closed rule with one hour of general debate for both joint resolutions and one motion to commit for both joint resolutions.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Held at the desk.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Received in the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 110. (text: CR S1500)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1478-1500)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
|
|
|