1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 1427 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the amount of |
---|
6 | 6 | | the adoption credit and to establish the in vitro fertilization expenses credit. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | FEBRUARY18, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. M |
---|
10 | 10 | | ACKENZIEintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the |
---|
11 | 11 | | Committee on Ways and Means |
---|
12 | 12 | | A BILL |
---|
13 | 13 | | To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase |
---|
14 | 14 | | the amount of the adoption credit and to establish the |
---|
15 | 15 | | in vitro fertilization expenses credit. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 1. INCREASE IN ADOPTION CREDIT AMOUNT. 3 |
---|
19 | 19 | | (a) I |
---|
20 | 20 | | NGENERAL.— 4 |
---|
21 | 21 | | (1) I |
---|
22 | 22 | | NCREASE IN CREDIT FOR ADOPTION OF 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | CHILD WITH SPECIAL NEEDS .—Section 23(a)(3) of 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended— 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) in the heading, by striking ‘‘ |
---|
26 | 26 | | $10,000’’ 8 |
---|
27 | 27 | | and inserting ‘‘ |
---|
28 | 28 | | $25,000’’, and 9 |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:41 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1427.IH H1427 |
---|
30 | 30 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •HR 1427 IH |
---|
32 | 32 | | (B) by striking ‘‘$10,000’’ and inserting 1 |
---|
33 | 33 | | ‘‘$25,000’’. 2 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) I |
---|
35 | 35 | | NCREASE IN MAXIMUM CREDIT AMOUNT .— 3 |
---|
36 | 36 | | Section 23(b)(1) of such Code is amended by strik-4 |
---|
37 | 37 | | ing ‘‘$10,000’’ and inserting ‘‘$25,000’’. 5 |
---|
38 | 38 | | (b) C |
---|
39 | 39 | | HANGE INBASEYEAR FORINFLATIONADJUST-6 |
---|
40 | 40 | | MENT.—Section 23(h) of such Code is amended to read 7 |
---|
41 | 41 | | as follows: 8 |
---|
42 | 42 | | ‘‘(h) A |
---|
43 | 43 | | DJUSTMENTS FOR INFLATION.— 9 |
---|
44 | 44 | | ‘‘(1) I |
---|
45 | 45 | | N GENERAL.—In the case of a taxable 10 |
---|
46 | 46 | | year beginning after December 31, 2025, each of the 11 |
---|
47 | 47 | | dollar amounts in subsection (a)(3) and paragraphs 12 |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) and (2)(A)(i) of subsection (b) shall be increased 13 |
---|
49 | 49 | | by an amount equal to— 14 |
---|
50 | 50 | | ‘‘(A) such dollar amount, multiplied by 15 |
---|
51 | 51 | | ‘‘(B) The cost-of-living adjustment deter-16 |
---|
52 | 52 | | mined under section 1(f)(3) for the calendar 17 |
---|
53 | 53 | | year in which the taxable year begins, deter-18 |
---|
54 | 54 | | mined by substituting ‘calendar year 2024’ for 19 |
---|
55 | 55 | | ‘calendar year 2016’ in subparagraph (A)(ii) 20 |
---|
56 | 56 | | thereof. 21 |
---|
57 | 57 | | ‘‘(2) R |
---|
58 | 58 | | OUNDING.—If any amount as increased 22 |
---|
59 | 59 | | under paragraph (1)is not a multiple of $10, such 23 |
---|
60 | 60 | | amount shall be rounded to the nearest multiple of 24 |
---|
61 | 61 | | $10. 25 |
---|
62 | 62 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:41 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1427.IH H1427 |
---|
63 | 63 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | •HR 1427 IH |
---|
65 | 65 | | ‘‘(3) SPECIAL RULE FOR INCOME LIMITA -1 |
---|
66 | 66 | | TION.—In the case of the dollar amount in sub-2 |
---|
67 | 67 | | section (b)(2)(A)(i), paragraph (1) shall be ap-3 |
---|
68 | 68 | | plied— 4 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ‘‘(A) by substituting ‘2002’ for ‘2024’ in 5 |
---|
70 | 70 | | the matter preceding subparagraph (A), and 6 |
---|
71 | 71 | | ‘‘(B) by substituting ‘calendar year 2001’ 7 |
---|
72 | 72 | | for ‘calendar year 2023’ in subparagraph (B) 8 |
---|
73 | 73 | | thereof.’’. 9 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (c) E |
---|
75 | 75 | | FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 10 |
---|
76 | 76 | | this section shall apply to taxable years beginning after 11 |
---|
77 | 77 | | December 31, 2024. 12 |
---|
78 | 78 | | SEC. 2. IN VITRO FERTILIZATION EXPENSES CREDIT. 13 |
---|
79 | 79 | | (a) I |
---|
80 | 80 | | NGENERAL.—Part IV of subchapter A of chap-14 |
---|
81 | 81 | | ter 1 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended 15 |
---|
82 | 82 | | by inserting after section 25E the following new section: 16 |
---|
83 | 83 | | ‘‘SEC. 25F. IN VITRO FERTILIZATION EXPENSES. 17 |
---|
84 | 84 | | ‘‘(a) C |
---|
85 | 85 | | REDITALLOWED.—In the case of an indi-18 |
---|
86 | 86 | | vidual, there shall be allowed as a credit against the tax 19 |
---|
87 | 87 | | imposed by this chapter the amount of the qualified in 20 |
---|
88 | 88 | | vitro fertilization expenses paid or incurred by the tax-21 |
---|
89 | 89 | | payer during the taxable year. 22 |
---|
90 | 90 | | ‘‘(b) Q |
---|
91 | 91 | | UALIFIED IN VITROFERTILIZATIONEX-23 |
---|
92 | 92 | | PENSES.—For purposes of this section, the term ‘qualified 24 |
---|
93 | 93 | | in vitro fertilization expenses’ means amounts paid or in-25 |
---|
94 | 94 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:02 Mar 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H1427.IH H1427 |
---|
95 | 95 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 |
---|
96 | 96 | | •HR 1427 IH |
---|
97 | 97 | | curred for medical care (as defined in section 213(d)) re-1 |
---|
98 | 98 | | lating to in vitro fertilization for the taxpayer (or the tax-2 |
---|
99 | 99 | | payer’s spouse, in the case of a joint return). 3 |
---|
100 | 100 | | ‘‘(c) N |
---|
101 | 101 | | ODOUBLEBENEFIT.—Any qualified in vitro 4 |
---|
102 | 102 | | fertilization expense which would (but for this subsection) 5 |
---|
103 | 103 | | be taken into account for purposes of any deduction (or 6 |
---|
104 | 104 | | any credit other than the credit allowed under this section) 7 |
---|
105 | 105 | | shall be reduced by the amount of the credit allowed under 8 |
---|
106 | 106 | | subsection (a) with respect to such expense.’’. 9 |
---|
107 | 107 | | (b) C |
---|
108 | 108 | | LERICALAMENDMENT.—The table of sections 10 |
---|
109 | 109 | | for Part IV of subchapter A of chapter 1 of such Code 11 |
---|
110 | 110 | | is amended by inserting after the item relating to section 12 |
---|
111 | 111 | | 25E the following new item: 13 |
---|
112 | 112 | | ‘‘Sec. 25F. In vitro fertilization expenses.’’. |
---|
113 | 113 | | (c) EFFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 14 |
---|
114 | 114 | | this shall apply to amounts paid or incurred after the date 15 |
---|
115 | 115 | | of the enactment of this section. 16 |
---|
116 | 116 | | Æ |
---|
117 | 117 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:41 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H1427.IH H1427 |
---|
118 | 118 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|