1 | 1 | | I |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. R. 2123 |
---|
5 | 5 | | To amend the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the |
---|
6 | 6 | | National Flood Insurance Program. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | MARCH14, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. G |
---|
10 | 10 | | ARBARINOintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the |
---|
11 | 11 | | Committee on Financial Services |
---|
12 | 12 | | A BILL |
---|
13 | 13 | | To amend the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to |
---|
14 | 14 | | reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program. |
---|
15 | 15 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1 |
---|
16 | 16 | | tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2 |
---|
17 | 17 | | SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3 |
---|
18 | 18 | | This Act may be cited as the ‘‘NFIP Extension Act 4 |
---|
19 | 19 | | of 2025’’. 5 |
---|
20 | 20 | | SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF THE NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE 6 |
---|
21 | 21 | | PROGRAM. 7 |
---|
22 | 22 | | (a) F |
---|
23 | 23 | | INANCING.—Section 1309(a) of the National 8 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4016(a)) is 9 |
---|
25 | 25 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:48 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2123.IH H2123 |
---|
26 | 26 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | •HR 2123 IH |
---|
28 | 28 | | amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 1 |
---|
29 | 29 | | ‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) P |
---|
31 | 31 | | ROGRAMEXPIRATION.—Section 1319 of the Na-3 |
---|
32 | 32 | | tional Flood Insurance Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 4026) is 4 |
---|
33 | 33 | | amended by striking ‘‘September 30, 2023’’ and inserting 5 |
---|
34 | 34 | | ‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 6 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) R |
---|
36 | 36 | | ETROACTIVEEFFECTIVEDATE.—If this Act is 7 |
---|
37 | 37 | | enacted after March 14, 2025, the amendments made by 8 |
---|
38 | 38 | | subsections (a) and (b) shall take effect as if enacted on 9 |
---|
39 | 39 | | March 14, 2025. 10 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Æ |
---|
41 | 41 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:48 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2123.IH H2123 |
---|
42 | 42 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|