Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2389 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/06/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2389 
To take certain land in the State of Washington into trust for the benefit 
of the Quinault Indian Nation, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH26, 2025 
Ms. R
ANDALLintroduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Natural Resources 
A BILL 
To take certain land in the State of Washington into trust 
for the benefit of the Quinault Indian Nation, and for 
other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Quinault Indian Na-4
tion Land Transfer Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. LAND TAKEN INTO TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF 6
THE QUINAULT INDIAN NATION. 7
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Subject to valid existing rights, 8
the approximately 72 acres of land located in the State 9
of Washington and generally depicted as ‘‘Allotment 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:52 Apr 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2389.IH H2389
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 2389 IH
1157’’ on the map entitled ‘‘Quinault Indian Nation Land 1
Transfer Act’’ and dated February 2, 2024, shall be ad-2
ministratively transferred from the Forest Service to the 3
Department of the Interior and taken into trust for the 4
benefit of the Quinault Indian Nation. 5
(b) L
ANDPART OFRESERVATION; ADMINISTRA-6
TION.—The land taken into trust under subsection (a) 7
shall be— 8
(1) part of the Quinault Indian Reservation; 9
and 10
(2) administered by the Secretary of the Inte-11
rior in accordance with the laws and regulations 12
generally applicable to property held in trust by the 13
United States for an Indian Tribe. 14
(c) G
AMINGPROHIBITED.—The land taken into trust 15
under subsection (a) shall not be eligible for gaming under 16
the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act (25 U.S.C. 2701 et 17
seq.). 18
(d) N
OIMPACT ONTREATYRIGHTS.—Nothing in 19
this Act affects treaty rights under the Treaty between 20
the United States and the Qui-nai-elt and Quil-leh-ute In-21
dians, done at the Qui-nai-elt River July 1, 1855, and 22
Olympia January 25, 1856 (12 Stat. 971) (commonly 23
known as the ‘‘Treaty of Olympia’’). 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:52 Apr 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2389.IH H2389
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 2389 IH
(e) HAZARDOUSMATERIALS.—For purposes of the 1
taking of land into trust under subsection (a), the Sec-2
retary of the Interior— 3
(1) shall meet disclosure requirements for haz-4
ardous substances, pollutants, or contaminants 5
under section 120(h) of the Comprehensive Environ-6
mental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act 7
of 1980 (42 U.S.C. 9620(h)); and 8
(2) shall not otherwise be required to remediate 9
or abate those hazardous substances, pollutants, or 10
contaminants. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:52 Apr 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2389.IH H2389
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB