Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2550 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/06/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2550 
To nullify the Executive Order relating to Exclusions from Federal Labor- 
Management Relations Programs, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL1, 2025 
Mr. G
OLDENof Maine (for himself, Mr. FITZPATRICK, Mr. NORCROSS, Mr. 
L
ALOTA, Mr. POCAN, Mr. TURNERof Ohio, Mrs. DINGELL, and Mr. 
L
AWLER) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on Oversight and Government Reform 
A BILL 
To nullify the Executive Order relating to Exclusions from 
Federal Labor-Management Relations Programs, and for 
other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Protect America’s 4
Workforce Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:43 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2550.IH H2550
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 2550 IH
SEC. 2. NULLIFICATION OF EXECUTIVE ORDER RELATING 1
TO EXCLUSIONS FROM FEDERAL LABOR-MAN-2
AGEMENT RELATIONS PROGRAMS. 3
The Executive order titled ‘‘Exclusions from Federal 4
Labor-Management Relations Programs’’, issued on 5
March 27, 2025, shall have no force or effect and no Fed-6
eral funds may be obligated or expended to carry out such 7
Executive order. 8
SEC. 3. COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENTS. 9
Any collective bargaining agreement in effect as of 10
March 26, 2025, between any executive branch Federal 11
agency and any labor organization that is an exclusive rep-12
resentative of Federal employees shall have full force and 13
effect through the stated term of the applicable agree-14
ment. 15
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 06:43 Apr 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2550.IH H2550
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB