Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2678 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 I
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. R. 2678
55 To provide for further comprehensive research at the National Institute of
66 Neurological Disorders and Stroke on unruptured intracranial aneurysms,
77 and for other purposes.
88 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
99 APRIL7, 2025
1010 Mr. F
1111 ITZPATRICK(for himself, Ms. CLARKEof New York, Mr. RUTHERFORD,
1212 and Ms. S
1313 CANLON) introduced the following bill; which was referred to
1414 the Committee on Energy and Commerce
1515 A BILL
1616 To provide for further comprehensive research at the Na-
1717 tional Institute of Neurological Disorders and Stroke
1818 on unruptured intracranial aneurysms, and for other pur-
1919 poses.
2020 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
2121 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2222 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2323 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Ellie Helton, Lisa 4
2424 Colagrossi, Kristen Shafer Englert, Teresa Anne Law-5
2525 rence, and Jennifer Sedney Focused Research Act’’ or 6
2626 ‘‘Ellie’s Law’’. 7
2727 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
2828 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2
2929 •HR 2678 IH
3030 SEC. 2. FINDINGS. 1
3131 The Congress makes the following findings: 2
3232 (1) An estimated 6.8 million people in the 3
3333 United States, or 1 in 50 people, have an 4
3434 unruptured brain aneurysm. 5
3535 (2) Each year, an estimated 30,000 people in 6
3636 the United States suffer a brain aneurysm rupture. 7
3737 Ruptured brain aneurysms are fatal in about 50 per-8
3838 cent of cases. Of those who survive, about 66 per-9
3939 cent suffer some permanent neurological deficit. 10
4040 (3) Brain aneurysms are more likely to occur in 11
4141 women than in men by a 3 to 2 ratio and nearly 12
4242 twice as likely to rupture in African Americans (2.1 13
4343 to 1 ratio) and Hispanics (1.67 to 1 ratio) than 14
4444 Caucasians. This Act represents all those who have 15
4545 been affected and died due to a ruptured brain an-16
4646 eurysm, and their loved ones. People who experi-17
4747 enced a brain aneurysm rupture include the fol-18
4848 lowing: 19
4949 (A) Ellie Helton. On July 16, 2014, Ellie 20
5050 Helton, a vibrant, loving 14-year-old from Apex, 21
5151 North Carolina, passed away as a result of a 22
5252 ruptured aneurysm, stunning her parents, two 23
5353 sisters, and many, many loved ones. A day ear-24
5454 lier, on her second day of high school, she woke 25
5555 up with a terrible headache after a plum-sized 26
5656 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
5757 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3
5858 •HR 2678 IH
5959 aneurysm on her brain stem ruptured. While 1
6060 she suffered headaches throughout her life, she 2
6161 was never diagnosed. Ellie was an avid reader 3
6262 and excellent student, loved the arts, and was 4
6363 incredibly creative. She had an unwavering, 5
6464 constant love for the family and friends in her 6
6565 life. 7
6666 (B) Lisa Colagrossi. On March 20, 2015, 8
6767 Lisa Colagrossi—WABC Eyewitness News re-9
6868 porter, wife of 17 years, and mother of two 10
6969 sons—unexpectedly passed away at the age of 11
7070 49 years after suffering a massive ruptured 12
7171 brain aneurysm. Despite experiencing one of 13
7272 the classic warning signs of a brain aneurysm 14
7373 (the ‘‘worst headache of my life’’), Lisa’s pass-15
7474 ing came as a tremendous shock to her family 16
7575 and friends, who did not know what a brain an-17
7676 eurysm was, let alone its signs and symptoms. 18
7777 She is remembered for being a loving wife, a 19
7878 mother, and a successful reporter, and for her 20
7979 love of the New York Rangers. 21
8080 (C) Kristen Shafer Englert. On November 22
8181 24, 2013, Kristen Shafer Englert, a devoted 23
8282 wife, mother, daughter, sister, aunt, and friend, 24
8383 passed away from a ruptured brain aneurysm 25
8484 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
8585 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4
8686 •HR 2678 IH
8787 at the age of 25, just weeks after giving birth 1
8888 to her son. Prior to her passing, she went to the 2
8989 emergency room with symptoms of a brain an-3
9090 eurysm and was sent home without a scan. 4
9191 Kristen was a dedicated teacher who loved chil-5
9292 dren. She was thrilled to become a mother. 6
9393 Sadly, she only experienced motherhood for a 7
9494 few short days. Kristen’s family members have 8
9595 been dedicated advocates since her passing. 9
9696 (D) Teresa Anne Lawrence. On December 10
9797 8, 1983, Teresa Anne Lawrence, a devoted 11
9898 mother of three, beloved wife, and staple of her 12
9999 community, collapsed while visiting her son’s 13
100100 school. She had been struggling with and taking 14
101101 medication for hypertension for several years. 15
102102 At age 34, after being unconscious for four 16
103103 days, she passed away as a result of a brain an-17
104104 eurysm. Her loving husband and extended fam-18
105105 ily were left to raise their children, whom Te-19
106106 resa cherished so much. 20
107107 (E) Jennifer Sedney. On December 25, 21
108108 2013, Jennifer Sedney, a beautiful, accom-22
109109 plished young woman, passed away suddenly at 23
110110 the age of 27 from a ruptured brain aneurysm. 24
111111 Her only symptom was the ‘‘worst headache of 25
112112 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
113113 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5
114114 •HR 2678 IH
115115 her life’’, which none of her friends or family 1
116116 realized was a symptom of a potentially fatal 2
117117 condition. Jenny was a jogger, a disciplined ex-3
118118 erciser, and a successful health care consultant 4
119119 and had recently launched a health blog found-5
120120 ed on three principles—‘‘bee curious, bee radi-6
121121 ant, bee well’’. Her brother, mother, and father, 7
122122 and a large devoted network of friends and rel-8
123123 atives, remember her every day. 9
124124 (4) Brain aneurysm ruptures have a significant 10
125125 fiscal impact on survivors, caretakers, and the health 11
126126 care community. The annual estimated pre-insur-12
127127 ance, direct cost of brain aneurysm ruptures to pa-13
128128 tients is approximately $2,000,000,000, and the me-14
129129 dian expected patient payment is $114,000. The 15
130130 length of stay in the intensive care unit is the larg-16
131131 est driver of cost for brain aneurysm ruptures, and 17
132132 estimates do not reflect indirect costs including trav-18
133133 el, food, child care, and wage losses for patients and 19
134134 caretakers. 20
135135 (5) Despite the widespread prevalence of this 21
136136 condition and the high societal cost it imposes on the 22
137137 Nation, the Federal Government only spends ap-23
138138 proximately $2.94 per year on brain aneurysm re-24
139139 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
140140 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 6
141141 •HR 2678 IH
142142 search for each person afflicted with a brain aneu-1
143143 rysm. 2
144144 (6) The first three iterations of the Inter-3
145145 national Study on Unruptured Intracranial Aneu-4
146146 rysms (ISUIA) have advanced researchers’ and clini-5
147147 cians’ understanding of how to most effectively man-6
148148 age and treat unruptured intracranial aneurysms. 7
149149 SEC. 3. FUNDING. 8
150150 (a) A
151151 UTHORIZATION OF APPROPRIATIONS.—To con-9
152152 duct or support further comprehensive research on 10
153153 unruptured intracranial aneurysms, studying a broader 11
154154 patient population diversified by age, sex, and race, there 12
155155 is authorized to be appropriated to the National Institute 13
156156 of Neurological Disorders and Stroke $20,000,000 for 14
157157 each of fiscal years 2026 through 2030, to remain avail-15
158158 able through September 30, 2033. 16
159159 (b) S
160160 UPPLEMENT, NOTSUPPLANT.—Any funds 17
161161 made available pursuant to this section shall supplement, 18
162162 not supplant, other funding made available for research 19
163163 on brain aneurysms. 20
164164 Æ
165165 VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:33 Apr 15, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2678.IH H2678
166166 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS