Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2757 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/23/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2757 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve coverage of 
audiology services under the Medicare program, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL9, 2025 
Mr. B
ILIRAKIS(for himself, Mr. MULLIN, Mr. MORAN, and Mr. MASSIE) in-
troduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on En-
ergy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and 
Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in 
each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdic-
tion of the committee concerned 
A BILL 
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to improve 
coverage of audiology services under the Medicare pro-
gram, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Medicare Audiology 4
Access Improvement Act of 2025’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:58 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2757.IH H2757
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 2757 IH
SEC. 2. COVERAGE OF AUDIOLOGY SERVICES UNDER THE 1
MEDICARE PROGRAM. 2
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Section 1861(s)(2) of the Social 3
Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395x(s)(2)) is amended— 4
(1) in subparagraph (JJ), by striking the semi-5
colon at the end and inserting ‘‘; and’’; and 6
(2) by adding at the end the following new sub-7
paragraph: 8
‘‘(KK) audiology services (as defined in sub-9
section (ll)(3));’’; and 10
(b) I
MPROVEDACCESS TOAUDIOLOGYSERVICES.— 11
Paragraph (3) of section 1861(ll) of the Social Security 12
Act (42 U.S.C. 1395x(ll)) is amended to read as follows: 13
‘‘(3) The term ‘audiology services’ means such hear-14
ing and balance assessment services furnished on or before 15
December 31, 2026, and beginning January 1, 2027, such 16
diagnostic or treatment services furnished by a qualified 17
audiologist which the qualified audiologist is legally au-18
thorized to perform under State law (or the regulatory 19
mechanism provided by State law), as would otherwise be 20
covered if furnished by a physician or as incident to a phy-21
sician’s service. A qualified audiologist shall be permitted 22
to furnish such audiology services without regard to any 23
requirement that the individual receiving such audiology 24
services is under the care of (or referred by) a physician 25
or other health care practitioner or that such services are 26
VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:58 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2757.IH H2757
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 2757 IH
furnished under the supervision of a physician or other 1
health care practitioner.’’. 2
(c) P
AYMENTAMOUNT ANDCOINSURANCE.—Section 3
1833(a)(1) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 4
1395l(a)(1)) is amended— 5
(1) by striking ‘‘and’’ before (HH); and 6
(2) by inserting the following before the semi-7
colon: ‘‘and (II) with respect to audiology services 8
furnished under section 1861(s)(2)(KK), the 9
amounts paid shall be 80 percent of the lesser of the 10
actual charge for the services or the fee schedule 11
amount provided under section 1848’’. 12
(d) P
AYMENT ON ASSIGNMENT-RELATEDBASIS.— 13
Section 1842(b)(18)(C) of the Social Security Act (42 14
U.S.C. 1395u(b)(18)(C)) is amended by adding at the end 15
the following new clause: 16
‘‘(ix) A qualified audiologist (as de-17
fined in section 1861(ll)(4)(B)).’’. 18
(e) I
NCLUSION OF QUALIFIEDAUDIOLOGISTS AS 19
RHC 
AND FQHC P RACTITIONERS.—Section 20
1861(aa)(1)(B) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 21
1395x(aa)(1)(B)) is amended by inserting ‘‘by a qualified 22
audiologist (as defined in subsection (ll)(4)(B)),’’ after 23
‘‘(as defined in subsection (hh)(1)),’’. 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:58 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2757.IH H2757
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HR 2757 IH
(f) RULE OF CONSTRUCTION.—Nothing in the 1
amendments made by this section shall be construed to 2
expand the scope of audiologist services or services for 3
which payment may be made to other providers under title 4
XVIII of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395 et seq.) 5
beyond those services for which such payment may be 6
made as of December 31, 2026. 7
(g) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 8
this section shall apply to items and services furnished on 9
or after January 1, 2027. 10
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 07:58 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2757.IH H2757
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB