Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2876 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/29/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 2876 
To confirm the use of certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake City, Utah, 
for public purposes, and for other purposes. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL10, 2025 
Mr. M
OOREof Utah (for himself, Mr. OWENS, Mr. KENNEDYof Utah, and 
Ms. M
ALOY) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on Natural Resources 
A BILL 
To confirm the use of certain non-Federal land in Salt Lake 
City, Utah, for public purposes, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘University of Utah 4
Research Park Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. CONFIRMATION OF USE OF CERTAIN NON-FEDERAL 6
LAND IN SALT LAKE CITY, UTAH, FOR VALID 7
PUBLIC PURPOSES. 8
(a) C
ONFIRMATION OFUSES.— 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:24 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2876.IH H2876
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 2876 IH
(1) IN GENERAL.—The use by the University of 1
Utah of the land described in subsection (b) as a 2
University research park, as approved by the letter 3
from the Secretary of the Interior to the University 4
of Utah dated December 10, 1970, and any modi-5
fications of the approved plan of development and 6
management approved by the Department of the In-7
terior prior to the date of enactment of this Act, is 8
confirmed as a valid public purpose consistent with 9
the requirements of the Act of June 14, 1926 (com-10
monly known as the ‘‘Recreation and Public Pur-11
poses Act’’) (44 Stat. 741, chapter 578; 43 U.S.C. 12
869 et seq.), subject to the terms and conditions in-13
cluded in the letter and approvals. 14
(2) O
THER USES.—Any other uses of the land 15
described in subsection (b) by the University of Utah 16
that are consistent with use as a University research 17
park and related university purposes (including de-18
velopment of student housing and a transit hub) are 19
confirmed as valid public purposes consistent with 20
the requirements of the Act of June 14, 1926 (com-21
monly known as the ‘‘Recreation and Public Pur-22
poses Act’’) (44 Stat. 741, chapter 578; 43 U.S.C. 23
869 et seq.). 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:24 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H2876.IH H2876
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HR 2876 IH
(b) DESCRIPTION OF NON-FEDERALLAND.—The 1
land referred to in subsection (a) is the approximately 2
593.54 acres of land conveyed to the University of Utah 3
under the Act of June 14, 1926 (commonly known as the 4
‘‘Recreation and Public Purposes Act’’) (44 Stat. 741, 5
chapter 578; 43 U.S.C. 869 et seq.), by patent numbered 6
43–99–0012 and dated October 18, 1968, and more par-7
ticularly described as tracts D (excluding parcels num-8
bered 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5), G, and J, T. 1 S., R. 1 E., Salt 9
Lake Meridian. 10
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:24 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H2876.IH H2876
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB