Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB326 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/10/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 326 
To require the GAO to conduct a study detailing the total cost of unused 
construction materials that were obtained for the construction of a border 
wall along the United States-Mexico border. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY9, 2025 
Ms. V
ANDUYNE(for herself, Ms. TENNEY, Mr. BALDERSON, and Mr. HARRIS 
of Maryland) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the 
Committee on Homeland Security 
A BILL 
To require the GAO to conduct a study detailing the total 
cost of unused construction materials that were obtained 
for the construction of a border wall along the United 
States-Mexico border. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Border Wall Waste 4
Accountability Act’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:56 Feb 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H326.IH H326
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 326 IH
SEC. 2. GAO STUDY ON COST OF UNUSED CONSTRUCTION 1
MATERIALS FOR BORDER WALL. 2
Not later than 90 days after the date of the enact-3
ment of this section, the Comptroller General of the 4
United States shall submit to Congress a study detailing 5
the total cost of unused construction materials that were 6
obtained for the construction of a border wall along the 7
United States-Mexico border from January 20, 2021, to 8
January 20, 2025. 9
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:56 Feb 04, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H326.IH H326
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB