Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB860 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/28/2025

                            I 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. R. 860 
To reauthorize the Congressional Award Act. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
JANUARY31, 2025 
Mr. H
UDSON(for himself and Mrs. DINGELL) introduced the following bill; 
which was referred to the Committee on Education and Workforce 
A BILL 
To reauthorize the Congressional Award Act. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Congressional Award 4
Program Reauthorization Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. TERMINATION. 6
(a) I
NGENERAL.—Section 108 of the Congressional 7
Award Act (2 U.S.C. 808) is amended by striking ‘‘Octo-8
ber 1, 2023’’ and inserting ‘‘October 1, 2028’’. 9
(b) R
ETROACTIVEEFFECTIVEDATE.—The amend-10
ment made by subsection (a) shall take effect as if enacted 11
on October 1, 2023. 12
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:33 Feb 27, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\H860.IH H860
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HR 860 IH
SEC. 3. OTHER AMENDMENTS. 1
Section 102 of the Congressional Award Act (2 2
U.S.C. 802) is amended— 3
(1) in subsection (a), by striking ‘‘Each medal 4
shall consist of gold-plate over bronze, rhodium over 5
bronze, or bronze and shall be struck in accordance 6
with subsection (f).’’; and 7
(2) in subsection (f)(1), in the second sentence, 8
by striking ‘‘Subject to subsection (a), the’’ and in-9
serting ‘‘The’’. 10
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:33 Feb 27, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\H860.IH H860
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB