Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR131 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/14/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 131 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Ethics in the 
One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY13, 2025 
Mr. G
UEST(for himself and Mr. DESAULNIER) submitted the following 
resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Administration 
RESOLUTION 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on 
Ethics in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
For the expenses of the Committee on Ethics (here-3
after in this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Committee’’), 4
including the expenses of all staff salaries, there shall be 5
paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House of Rep-6
resentatives for committee salaries and expenses, not more 7
than $9,276,290 for the One Hundred Nineteenth Con-8
gress. 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:52 Feb 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR131.IH HR131
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 131 IH 
SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
(1) not more than $4,530,566 shall be available 3
for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4
noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5
before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
(2) not more than $4,745,724 shall be available 7
for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8
noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9
before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
the Committee on House Administration. 19
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 23:52 Feb 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR131.IH HR131
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS