Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR138 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/15/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 138 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY14, 2025 
Mr. M
ASTsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on House Administration 
RESOLUTION 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on 
Foreign Affairs in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
For the expenses of the Foreign Affairs (hereafter in 3
this resolution referred to as the ‘‘Committee’’), including 4
the expenses of all staff salaries, there shall be paid, out 5
of the applicable accounts of the House of Representatives 6
for committee salaries and expenses, not more than 7
$24,376,741 for the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 8
SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 9
Of the amount specified in section 1— 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:43 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR138.IH HR138
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 138 IH 
(1) not more than $11,683,048 shall be avail-1
able for expenses incurred during the period begin-2
ning at noon on January 3, 2025, and ending imme-3
diately before noon on January 3, 2026; and 4
(2) not more than $12,693,693 shall be avail-5
able for expenses incurred during the period begin-6
ning at noon on January 3, 2026, and ending imme-7
diately before noon on January 3, 2027. 8
SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 9
Payments under this resolution shall be made on 10
vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 11
Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 12
directed by the Committee on House Administration. 13
SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 14
Amounts made available under this resolution shall 15
be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 16
the Committee on House Administration. 17
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:43 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR138.IH HR138
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS