Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR140 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/15/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 140 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Education and 
Workforce in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
FEBRUARY14, 2025 
Mr. W
ALBERG(for himself and Mr. SCOTTof Virginia) submitted the fol-
lowing resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Admin-
istration 
RESOLUTION 
Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on 
Education and Workforce in the One Hundred Nine-
teenth Congress. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
For the expenses of the Committee on Education and 3
Workforce (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the 4
‘‘Committee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, 5
there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the 6
House of Representatives for committee salaries and ex-7
penses, not more than $22,033,322.00 for the One Hun-8
dred Nineteenth Congress. 9
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:42 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR140.IH HR140
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 140 IH 
SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
(1) not more than $10,979,883.00 shall be 3
available for expenses incurred during the period be-4
ginning at noon on January 3, 2025, and ending im-5
mediately before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
(2) not more than $11,053,439.00 shall be 7
available for expenses incurred during the period be-8
ginning at noon on January 3, 2026, and ending im-9
mediately before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
the Committee on House Administration. 19
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:42 Feb 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR140.IH HR140
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS