1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 188 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Affirming the obligation of the President of the United States to comply |
---|
6 | 6 | | with court orders. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | MARCH4, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. M |
---|
10 | 10 | | ULLIN(for himself, Mrs. RAMIREZ, Ms. WILLIAMSof Georgia, Ms. NOR- |
---|
11 | 11 | | TON, Ms. CLARKEof New York, Mr. THOMPSONof Mississippi, Ms. |
---|
12 | 12 | | T |
---|
13 | 13 | | LAIB, Mrs. WATSONCOLEMAN, Mr. THANEDAR, Mr. MCGOVERN, Mr. |
---|
14 | 14 | | G |
---|
15 | 15 | | RIJALVA, Mr. SOTO, Ms. BARRAGA´N, Mr. SWALWELL, Mrs. TORRESof |
---|
16 | 16 | | California, Mr. K |
---|
17 | 17 | | HANNA, Ms. MCCOLLUM, Mrs. MCIVER, Ms. KELLYof |
---|
18 | 18 | | Illinois, and Mr. G |
---|
19 | 19 | | REENof Texas) submitted the following resolution; |
---|
20 | 20 | | which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary |
---|
21 | 21 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
22 | 22 | | Affirming the obligation of the President of the United |
---|
23 | 23 | | States to comply with court orders. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the Western |
---|
25 | 25 | | District of Washington on January 23, 2025, the United |
---|
26 | 26 | | States District Court for the District of Maryland on |
---|
27 | 27 | | February 5, 2025, and the United States District Court |
---|
28 | 28 | | for the District of New Hampshire on February 10, |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2025, issued temporary restraining orders to prevent |
---|
30 | 30 | | President of the United States Donald J. Trump from |
---|
31 | 31 | | enforcing or implementing his executive order that would |
---|
32 | 32 | | deny citizenship to individuals born in the United States; |
---|
33 | 33 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:58 Mar 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR188.IH HR188 |
---|
34 | 34 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
35 | 35 | | •HRES 188 IH |
---|
36 | 36 | | Whereas the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth |
---|
37 | 37 | | Circuit on February 20, 2025, denied an emergency re- |
---|
38 | 38 | | quest to lift an injunction on President Trump’s execu- |
---|
39 | 39 | | tive order that would deny citizenship to individuals born |
---|
40 | 40 | | in the United States; |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the District of |
---|
42 | 42 | | Columbia on January 28, 2025, and the United States |
---|
43 | 43 | | District Court for the District of Rhode Island on Janu- |
---|
44 | 44 | | ary 31, 2025, and again on February 10, 2025, issued |
---|
45 | 45 | | temporary restraining orders to prevent the Trump ad- |
---|
46 | 46 | | ministration from pausing, freezing, or terminating Fed- |
---|
47 | 47 | | eral funds appropriated by Congress; |
---|
48 | 48 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the Southern |
---|
49 | 49 | | District of New York issued a temporary order on Feb- |
---|
50 | 50 | | ruary 8, 2025, preventing President Trump from grant- |
---|
51 | 51 | | ing access to Treasury Department payment records and |
---|
52 | 52 | | systems to any individual other than civil servants with |
---|
53 | 53 | | a need for access to perform their job duties; |
---|
54 | 54 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the District of |
---|
55 | 55 | | Columbia on February 25, 2025, entered a preliminary |
---|
56 | 56 | | injunction preventing the Office of Management and |
---|
57 | 57 | | Budget from implementing, giving effect to, or rein- |
---|
58 | 58 | | stating a memorandum freezing all federal financial as- |
---|
59 | 59 | | sistance under open awards; |
---|
60 | 60 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the Southern |
---|
61 | 61 | | District of New York on February 21, 2025, granted a |
---|
62 | 62 | | preliminary injunction barring the Treasury Department |
---|
63 | 63 | | from granting any member of the DOGE team access to |
---|
64 | 64 | | payment records, payment systems, or any other data |
---|
65 | 65 | | systems maintained by the Treasury Department; |
---|
66 | 66 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:58 Mar 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR188.IH HR188 |
---|
67 | 67 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
68 | 68 | | •HRES 188 IH |
---|
69 | 69 | | Whereas the United States District Court for the Northern |
---|
70 | 70 | | District of California on February 27, 2025, issued a |
---|
71 | 71 | | temporary restraining order requiring the Office of Per- |
---|
72 | 72 | | sonnel and Management to rescind a directive to termi- |
---|
73 | 73 | | nate employees at the Department of Veterans Affairs, |
---|
74 | 74 | | the National Park Service, the Small Business Adminis- |
---|
75 | 75 | | tration, the Bureau of Land Management, the Depart- |
---|
76 | 76 | | ment of Defense, and the Fish and Wildlife Service; |
---|
77 | 77 | | Whereas, on February 9, 2025, Vice President of the United |
---|
78 | 78 | | States J.D. Vance declared on X: ‘‘Judges aren’t allowed |
---|
79 | 79 | | to control the executive’s legitimate power’’; |
---|
80 | 80 | | Whereas, on February 15, 2025, President Trump declared |
---|
81 | 81 | | on X: ‘‘He who saves his Country does not violate any |
---|
82 | 82 | | Law’’; |
---|
83 | 83 | | Whereas it has been established since 1803 in Marbury v. |
---|
84 | 84 | | Madison that it is ‘‘the province and duty of the judicial |
---|
85 | 85 | | department to say what the law is’’, and it has been fur- |
---|
86 | 86 | | ther established since 1952 in Youngstown Sheet & Tube |
---|
87 | 87 | | Co. v. Sawyer that the President’s power ‘‘must stem ei- |
---|
88 | 88 | | ther from an Act of Congress or from the Constitution’’; |
---|
89 | 89 | | Whereas the United States Constitution, and hundreds of |
---|
90 | 90 | | years of common law tradition, require all persons to |
---|
91 | 91 | | comply with orders issued by duly established courts of |
---|
92 | 92 | | jurisdiction; |
---|
93 | 93 | | Whereas the legal process allows for the opportunity to ap- |
---|
94 | 94 | | peal a decision with which a litigant disagrees; |
---|
95 | 95 | | Whereas the duty to abide by a court order applies equally |
---|
96 | 96 | | to all persons of the United States, including but not lim- |
---|
97 | 97 | | ited to government lawyers, all of whom must practice |
---|
98 | 98 | | law in accordance with federal and state law; |
---|
99 | 99 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:58 Mar 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR188.IH HR188 |
---|
100 | 100 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 |
---|
101 | 101 | | •HRES 188 IH |
---|
102 | 102 | | Whereas those who defy a court order must be held account- |
---|
103 | 103 | | able by our legal system; and |
---|
104 | 104 | | Whereas failing to comply with court orders puts the rule of |
---|
105 | 105 | | law and the separation of powers established by the Con- |
---|
106 | 106 | | stitution in grave jeopardy: Now, therefore, be it |
---|
107 | 107 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
108 | 108 | | (1) affirms the essential role of the judiciary in 2 |
---|
109 | 109 | | upholding checks and balances among the three co-3 |
---|
110 | 110 | | equal branches of the United States Government; 4 |
---|
111 | 111 | | (2) calls on President Donald J. Trump and his 5 |
---|
112 | 112 | | administration to immediately comply with all exist-6 |
---|
113 | 113 | | ing court orders and decisions going forward; and 7 |
---|
114 | 114 | | (3) affirms the judiciary’s authority to use all 8 |
---|
115 | 115 | | of the tools given to it by the Constitution and Con-9 |
---|
116 | 116 | | gress to enforce its orders. 10 |
---|
117 | 117 | | Æ |
---|
118 | 118 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:58 Mar 05, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR188.IH HR188 |
---|
119 | 119 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|