1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 217 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America on its 113th birthday |
---|
6 | 6 | | and celebrating its founder Juliette Gordon Low and the legacy of |
---|
7 | 7 | | providing girls with a secure and inclusive space where they can explore |
---|
8 | 8 | | their world, build meaningful relationships, and have access to experi- |
---|
9 | 9 | | ences that prepare them for a life of leadership. |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
11 | 11 | | MARCH11, 2025 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Mrs. K |
---|
13 | 13 | | IM(for herself, Mrs. WATSONCOLEMAN, Ms. MCCOLLUM, Ms. |
---|
14 | 14 | | M |
---|
15 | 15 | | ALLIOTAKIS, Ms. WILLIAMSof Georgia, Ms. SCANLON, Mr. |
---|
16 | 16 | | G |
---|
17 | 17 | | ARBARINO, and Mr. CARTERof Georgia) submitted the following resolu- |
---|
18 | 18 | | tion; which was referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government |
---|
19 | 19 | | Reform |
---|
20 | 20 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
21 | 21 | | Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America |
---|
22 | 22 | | on its 113th birthday and celebrating its founder Juliette |
---|
23 | 23 | | Gordon Low and the legacy of providing girls with a |
---|
24 | 24 | | secure and inclusive space where they can explore their |
---|
25 | 25 | | world, build meaningful relationships, and have access |
---|
26 | 26 | | to experiences that prepare them for a life of leadership. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Whereas March 12, 2025, marks the 113th anniversary of |
---|
28 | 28 | | Girl Scouts of the United States of America, whose mis- |
---|
29 | 29 | | sion is to ‘‘build girls of courage, confidence, and char- |
---|
30 | 30 | | acter, who make the world a better place’’; |
---|
31 | 31 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217 |
---|
32 | 32 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
33 | 33 | | •HRES 217 IH |
---|
34 | 34 | | Whereas Girl Scouts offers girls 21st century programming |
---|
35 | 35 | | in science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM), |
---|
36 | 36 | | the outdoors, entrepreneurship, and beyond, helping girls |
---|
37 | 37 | | develop invaluable life skills through the Girl Scout Lead- |
---|
38 | 38 | | ership Experience; |
---|
39 | 39 | | Whereas, today, more than 50,000,000 women—trailblazers, |
---|
40 | 40 | | visionaries, and leaders—are Girl Scout alums who em- |
---|
41 | 41 | | body the Girl Scout mission every day; |
---|
42 | 42 | | Whereas the Girl Scout movement began on March 12, 1912, |
---|
43 | 43 | | when Juliette ‘‘Daisy’’ Gordon Low, a native of Savan- |
---|
44 | 44 | | nah, Georgia, organized a group of 18 girls and provided |
---|
45 | 45 | | them with the opportunity to develop physically, intellec- |
---|
46 | 46 | | tually, socially, and spiritually; |
---|
47 | 47 | | Whereas public service and civic engagement were a corner- |
---|
48 | 48 | | stone of Juliette Gordon Low’s life and remain an impor- |
---|
49 | 49 | | tant part of today’s Girl Scout experience, with program- |
---|
50 | 50 | | ming designed to encourage girls to seek opportunities to |
---|
51 | 51 | | learn about Federal, State, and local government, re- |
---|
52 | 52 | | search and engage with their elected officials, and inspire |
---|
53 | 53 | | girls to become civically minded individuals equipped with |
---|
54 | 54 | | the tools to make a positive change in the world; |
---|
55 | 55 | | Whereas Girl Scouts’ commitment to getting girls outdoors, |
---|
56 | 56 | | including exciting summer camp experiences, comes from |
---|
57 | 57 | | Juliette Gordon Low’s lifelong appreciation for nature |
---|
58 | 58 | | and the environment; |
---|
59 | 59 | | Whereas Juliette Gordon Low utilized her extensive network |
---|
60 | 60 | | of friends across the country and around the world to es- |
---|
61 | 61 | | tablish the foundation for the Girl Scout movement, cre- |
---|
62 | 62 | | ating opportunities for girls to form lifelong friendships |
---|
63 | 63 | | with fellow Girl Scouts; |
---|
64 | 64 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217 |
---|
65 | 65 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
66 | 66 | | •HRES 217 IH |
---|
67 | 67 | | Whereas Juliette Gordon Low believed in the power of global |
---|
68 | 68 | | connections and the ability of Girl Guides and Girl |
---|
69 | 69 | | Scouts to positively impact their communities and the |
---|
70 | 70 | | world, serving as the movement’s worldwide ambassador |
---|
71 | 71 | | and first Girl Scout Global Citizen; |
---|
72 | 72 | | Whereas, on March 25, 2025, the Juliette Gordon Low Com- |
---|
73 | 73 | | memorative Quarter will be released into circulation by |
---|
74 | 74 | | the United States Mint, celebrating the enduring legacy |
---|
75 | 75 | | of the Girl Scout founder and the Girl Scout movement; |
---|
76 | 76 | | and |
---|
77 | 77 | | Whereas Juliette Gordon Low’s journey from trailblazing |
---|
78 | 78 | | leader to a face on our Nation’s currency is a testament |
---|
79 | 79 | | to the power of girls and women everywhere: Now, there- |
---|
80 | 80 | | fore, be it |
---|
81 | 81 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | (1) recognizes Girl Scouts of the United States 2 |
---|
83 | 83 | | of America for 113 years of building girls of cour-3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | age, confidence, and character, who make the world 4 |
---|
85 | 85 | | a better place; 5 |
---|
86 | 86 | | (2) congratulates all Girl Scouts who earned the 6 |
---|
87 | 87 | | Gold Award in 2024; 7 |
---|
88 | 88 | | (3) commemorates the trailblazing founder of 8 |
---|
89 | 89 | | Girl Scouts of the United States of America, Juliette 9 |
---|
90 | 90 | | Gordon Low, for making her mark on American cur-10 |
---|
91 | 91 | | rency; and 11 |
---|
92 | 92 | | (4) encourages Girl Scouts of the United States 12 |
---|
93 | 93 | | of America to continue to champion the ambitions, 13 |
---|
94 | 94 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217 |
---|
95 | 95 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 |
---|
96 | 96 | | •HRES 217 IH |
---|
97 | 97 | | nurture the creativity, and support the talents of fu-1 |
---|
98 | 98 | | ture women leaders. 2 |
---|
99 | 99 | | Æ |
---|
100 | 100 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:23 Mar 12, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR217.IH HR217 |
---|
101 | 101 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|