Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR226 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 226 
Commemorating the centennial of Delta Air Lines. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MARCH14, 2025 
Ms. W
ILLIAMSof Georgia (for herself, Mr. JACK, Mr. CARTERof Georgia, Mr. 
B
ISHOP, Mr. JOHNSONof Georgia, Mrs. MCBATH, Mr. MCCORMICK, Mr. 
C
OLLINS, Mr. LOUDERMILK, Mr. ALLEN, Mr. DAVIDSCOTTof Georgia, 
Mr. A
MODEIof Nevada, Mr. BERGMAN, Mr. CARBAJAL, Mr. CARTERof 
Louisiana, Mr. N
EHLS, Mr. SOTO, Mr. THANEDAR, Mr. YAKYM, and Mr. 
Z
INKE) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
Committee on Energy and Commerce 	RESOLUTION 
Commemorating the centennial of Delta Air Lines. 
Whereas, on March 2, 2025, Delta Air Lines turns 100 years 
old, becoming the first United States airline to reach the 
centenarian milestone; 
Whereas Delta Air Lines was founded on March 2, 1925, as 
Huff Daland Dusters—the world’s first aerial crop-dust-
ing company; 
Whereas Delta Air Service and the airline’s first flights took 
off 4 years later; 
Whereas, in 2025, Delta Air Lines’s team of 100,000 people 
supports up to 5,000 daily flights serving more than 
200,000,000 travelers per year; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:29 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR226.IH HR226
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 226 IH 
Whereas Delta Air Lines maintains hubs from coast to coast, 
including in Georgia, Massachusetts, New York, Wash-
ington, California, Michigan, Minnesota, and Utah; 
Whereas, with thousands of peak-day departures to more 
than 290 global destinations on 6 continents, Delta Air 
Lines connects millions of people around the globe to and 
through the United States daily and helps keep the 
United States a top country for business and the econ-
omy of the United States strong; 
Whereas, for the past 100 years, the mission of Delta Air 
Lines to connect the world has included a commitment to 
being a strong partner in the communities where its peo-
ple live, work, and serve; and 
Whereas, in 2025, Delta was named North America’s most 
on-time airline by Cirium, the Top United States Airline 
by the Wall Street Journal, the World’s Most Admired 
Airline by Fortune, and the top-ranked airline on Time’s 
inaugural World’s Best Companies List: Now, therefore 
be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) recognizes Delta Air Lines for 100 years of 2
connecting people to the world and to each other; 3
and 4
(2) commemorates the centennial of Delta Air 5
Lines. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:29 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR226.IH HR226
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB