1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 295 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard National |
---|
6 | 6 | | Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign Terrorist Organizations. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | APRIL7, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. C |
---|
10 | 10 | | RANK(for himself, Mr. TIFFANY, Ms. BOEBERT, Mr. GUEST, and Mrs. |
---|
11 | 11 | | B |
---|
12 | 12 | | IGGSof South Carolina) submitted the following resolution; which was |
---|
13 | 13 | | referred to the Committee on the Judiciary |
---|
14 | 14 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
15 | 15 | | Expressing Support for the President’s Actions to Safeguard |
---|
16 | 16 | | National Security and Eliminate Threats from Foreign |
---|
17 | 17 | | Terrorist Organizations. |
---|
18 | 18 | | Whereas, on January 20, 2025, President Trump issued Ex- |
---|
19 | 19 | | ecutive Order 14157, designating cartels and other orga- |
---|
20 | 20 | | nizations as Foreign Terrorist Organizations (FTOs) and |
---|
21 | 21 | | Specially Designated Global Terrorists (SDGTs); |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas Tren de Aragua (TdA), who has been directed to at- |
---|
23 | 23 | | tack U.S. law enforcement officers, was specifically |
---|
24 | 24 | | named as a FTO under this Executive order; |
---|
25 | 25 | | Whereas in early February 2025, President Bukele met with |
---|
26 | 26 | | Secretary of State Marco Rubio and agreed to imprison |
---|
27 | 27 | | members of Tren de Aragua of behalf of the United |
---|
28 | 28 | | States; |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295 |
---|
30 | 30 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •HRES 295 IH |
---|
32 | 32 | | Whereas, on March 15, 2025, President Trump invoked the |
---|
33 | 33 | | Alien Enemies Act in response to the infiltration of the |
---|
34 | 34 | | United States by Tren de Aragua; |
---|
35 | 35 | | Whereas, on March 15, 2025, two flights carrying noncitizen |
---|
36 | 36 | | members of Tren de Aragua and the Salvadoran gang |
---|
37 | 37 | | MS–13 departed U.S. airspace; |
---|
38 | 38 | | Whereas, on March 16, 2025, El Salvador President Nayib |
---|
39 | 39 | | Bukele received these two flights and immediately trans- |
---|
40 | 40 | | ferred the SDGTs into El Salvador’s Terrorism Confine- |
---|
41 | 41 | | ment Center (CECOT) for detention. |
---|
42 | 42 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) supports the President’s Action to remove 2 |
---|
44 | 44 | | foreign terrorists under the Alien Enemies Act, 50 3 |
---|
45 | 45 | | U.S.C. 21 et seq.; 4 |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) affirms that, as Commander in Chief, the 5 |
---|
47 | 47 | | President has executive authority to detain, deport, 6 |
---|
48 | 48 | | or restrict non-citizens from a Foreign Terrorist Or-7 |
---|
49 | 49 | | ganization; and 8 |
---|
50 | 50 | | (3) endorses the complete elimination of these 9 |
---|
51 | 51 | | organizations from the United States to protect the 10 |
---|
52 | 52 | | nation’s territory, safety, and security. 11 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Æ |
---|
54 | 54 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:29 Apr 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR295.IH HR295 |
---|
55 | 55 | | ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS |
---|