IV 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. RES. 315 Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 1866. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES APRIL9, 2025 Mr. J ACKSONof Illinois (for himself, Ms. TLAIB, Ms. CROCKETT, Ms. BROWN, Ms. G ARCIAof Texas, Mr. KENNEDYof New York, Mr. FIELDS, Mr. T HANEDAR, Ms. STEVENS, Mr. ESPAILLAT, and Ms. NORTON) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Ju- diciary RESOLUTION Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 1866. Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was passed and enacted into law; Whereas this year marks the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 1866; Whereas the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was the first Federal law to define citizenship and affirm that all citizens are equally protected by the law; Whereas the intent of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was to combat the attempted suppression of the Emancipation Proclamation; VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 •HRES 315 IH Whereas President Andrew Johnson established a reconstruc- tion policy that forced former Confederate States to maintain abolition, swear loyalty to the United States, and pay their war debts in order to rejoin the Union; Whereas under President Johnson’s policy, Southern States adopted and enacted a series of laws designed to restrict freed Blacks and ensure their availability in the labor force; Whereas these laws severely denied Black citizens equal pro- tection under the law; Whereas under restricted laws, Blacks were refrained from owning property, entering contracts, and benefiting from labor rights; Whereas a brave set of legislators believed the Federal Gov- ernment had a role in shaping a multiracial society in postwar South; Whereas Senator Lyman Trumbull of Illinois introduced the Civil Rights Act of 1866 in the Senate on January 5, 1866; Whereas, on February 2, 1866, the Senate voted in favor of the bill 33–13; Whereas, on March 13, 1866, the House of Representatives voted in favor of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 by a vote of 111–38, with 34 Members not voting; Whereas, on March 27, 1866, President Andrew Johnson ve- toed the Civil Rights Act of 1866; Whereas, on April 6, 1866, the Senate voted 33–15 to over- ride President Johnson’s veto; VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 •HRES 315 IH Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the House also voted to override President Johnson’s veto by a vote of 122–41 with 21 Members not voting; and Whereas as a result of both Chambers voting to override President Johnson’s veto, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 became the law of the land: Now, therefore, be it Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 (1) recognizes the significance of the Civil 2 Rights Act of 1866 and its impact on establishing 3 that all Americans, despite their race, are protected 4 equally under the law; 5 (2) recognizes that the Civil Rights Act of 1866 6 is the framework from which the Thirteenth and 7 Fourteenth Amendments were crafted; and 8 (3) recognizes the importance of the rule of law 9 and advocates to support, protect, and defend the 10 rights of all Americans. 11 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB