1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 315 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 1866. |
---|
6 | 6 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
7 | 7 | | APRIL9, 2025 |
---|
8 | 8 | | Mr. J |
---|
9 | 9 | | ACKSONof Illinois (for himself, Ms. TLAIB, Ms. CROCKETT, Ms. BROWN, |
---|
10 | 10 | | Ms. G |
---|
11 | 11 | | ARCIAof Texas, Mr. KENNEDYof New York, Mr. FIELDS, Mr. |
---|
12 | 12 | | T |
---|
13 | 13 | | HANEDAR, Ms. STEVENS, Mr. ESPAILLAT, and Ms. NORTON) submitted |
---|
14 | 14 | | the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Ju- |
---|
15 | 15 | | diciary |
---|
16 | 16 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
17 | 17 | | Recognizing the 159th anniversary of the Civil Rights Act |
---|
18 | 18 | | of 1866. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was |
---|
20 | 20 | | passed and enacted into law; |
---|
21 | 21 | | Whereas this year marks the 159th anniversary of the Civil |
---|
22 | 22 | | Rights Act of 1866; |
---|
23 | 23 | | Whereas the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was the first Federal |
---|
24 | 24 | | law to define citizenship and affirm that all citizens are |
---|
25 | 25 | | equally protected by the law; |
---|
26 | 26 | | Whereas the intent of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 was to |
---|
27 | 27 | | combat the attempted suppression of the Emancipation |
---|
28 | 28 | | Proclamation; |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 |
---|
30 | 30 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •HRES 315 IH |
---|
32 | 32 | | Whereas President Andrew Johnson established a reconstruc- |
---|
33 | 33 | | tion policy that forced former Confederate States to |
---|
34 | 34 | | maintain abolition, swear loyalty to the United States, |
---|
35 | 35 | | and pay their war debts in order to rejoin the Union; |
---|
36 | 36 | | Whereas under President Johnson’s policy, Southern States |
---|
37 | 37 | | adopted and enacted a series of laws designed to restrict |
---|
38 | 38 | | freed Blacks and ensure their availability in the labor |
---|
39 | 39 | | force; |
---|
40 | 40 | | Whereas these laws severely denied Black citizens equal pro- |
---|
41 | 41 | | tection under the law; |
---|
42 | 42 | | Whereas under restricted laws, Blacks were refrained from |
---|
43 | 43 | | owning property, entering contracts, and benefiting from |
---|
44 | 44 | | labor rights; |
---|
45 | 45 | | Whereas a brave set of legislators believed the Federal Gov- |
---|
46 | 46 | | ernment had a role in shaping a multiracial society in |
---|
47 | 47 | | postwar South; |
---|
48 | 48 | | Whereas Senator Lyman Trumbull of Illinois introduced the |
---|
49 | 49 | | Civil Rights Act of 1866 in the Senate on January 5, |
---|
50 | 50 | | 1866; |
---|
51 | 51 | | Whereas, on February 2, 1866, the Senate voted in favor of |
---|
52 | 52 | | the bill 33–13; |
---|
53 | 53 | | Whereas, on March 13, 1866, the House of Representatives |
---|
54 | 54 | | voted in favor of the Civil Rights Act of 1866 by a vote |
---|
55 | 55 | | of 111–38, with 34 Members not voting; |
---|
56 | 56 | | Whereas, on March 27, 1866, President Andrew Johnson ve- |
---|
57 | 57 | | toed the Civil Rights Act of 1866; |
---|
58 | 58 | | Whereas, on April 6, 1866, the Senate voted 33–15 to over- |
---|
59 | 59 | | ride President Johnson’s veto; |
---|
60 | 60 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 |
---|
61 | 61 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
62 | 62 | | •HRES 315 IH |
---|
63 | 63 | | Whereas, on April 9, 1866, the House also voted to override |
---|
64 | 64 | | President Johnson’s veto by a vote of 122–41 with 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | Members not voting; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | Whereas as a result of both Chambers voting to override |
---|
67 | 67 | | President Johnson’s veto, the Civil Rights Act of 1866 |
---|
68 | 68 | | became the law of the land: Now, therefore, be it |
---|
69 | 69 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) recognizes the significance of the Civil 2 |
---|
71 | 71 | | Rights Act of 1866 and its impact on establishing 3 |
---|
72 | 72 | | that all Americans, despite their race, are protected 4 |
---|
73 | 73 | | equally under the law; 5 |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) recognizes that the Civil Rights Act of 1866 6 |
---|
75 | 75 | | is the framework from which the Thirteenth and 7 |
---|
76 | 76 | | Fourteenth Amendments were crafted; and 8 |
---|
77 | 77 | | (3) recognizes the importance of the rule of law 9 |
---|
78 | 78 | | and advocates to support, protect, and defend the 10 |
---|
79 | 79 | | rights of all Americans. 11 |
---|
80 | 80 | | Æ |
---|
81 | 81 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:18 Apr 10, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR315.IH HR315 |
---|
82 | 82 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|