Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR334 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/18/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 334 
Amending House Resolution 211 with respect to a national emergency de-
clared by the President on February 1, 2025, and House Resolution 
313 with respect to a national emergency declared by the President 
on April 2, 2025. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL17, 2025 
Mr. K
ENNEDYof New York submitted the following resolution; which was 
referred to the Committee on Rules 
RESOLUTION 
Amending House Resolution 211 with respect to a national 
emergency declared by the President on February 1, 
2025, and House Resolution 313 with respect to a na-
tional emergency declared by the President on April 2, 
2025. 
Resolved, 1
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:50 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR334.IH HR334
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 334 IH 
SECTION 1. ENSURING DAYS OCCURRING DURING FIRST 1
SESSION CONSTITUTE CALENDAR DAYS FOR 2
PURPOSES OF JOINT RESOLUTION TERMI-3
NATING A NATIONAL EMERGENCY DECLARED 4
BY THE PRESIDENT ON FEBRUARY 1, 2025. 5
(a) T
REATMENT OF DAYS ASCALENDARDAYS.— 6
House Resolution 211, agreed to March 11, 2025, is 7
amended by striking section 4. 8
(b) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by 9
subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the adop-10
tion of House Resolution 211. 11
SEC. 2. ENSURING DAYS OCCURRING DURING FIRST SES-12
SION CONSTITUTE CALENDAR DAYS FOR 13
PURPOSES OF JOINT RESOLUTION TERMI-14
NATING A NATIONAL EMERGENCY DECLARED 15
BY THE PRESIDENT ON APRIL 2, 2025. 16
(a) T
REATMENT OF DAYS ASCALENDARDAYS.— 17
House Resolution 313, agreed to April 9, 2025, is amend-18
ed by striking section 2. 19
(b) E
FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendment made by 20
subsection (a) shall take effect as if included in the adop-21
tion of House Resolution 313. 22
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:50 Apr 17, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR334.IH HR334
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS