IV 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION H. RES. 352 Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter antisemitism and educate the public on the contributions of the Jewish American community. IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES APRIL24, 2025 Ms. W ASSERMANSCHULTZ(for herself, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. CARTERof Louisiana, and Mr. F ITZPATRICK) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary RESOLUTION Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter antisemitism and educate the public on the contributions of the Jewish American community. Whereas ‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ has its origins in 1980, when Congress enacted a Joint Resolution enti- tled ‘‘joint resolution to authorize and request the Presi- dent to issue a proclamation designating April 21 through April 28, 1980, as ‘Jewish Heritage Week’’’, ap- proved April 24, 1980 (Public Law 96–237; 94 Stat. 338); Whereas, on April 24, 1980, President Carter issued the proclamation for ‘‘Jewish Heritage Week’’, and in that proclamation, President Carter spoke about the bountiful VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 •HRES 352 IH contributions made by the Jewish people to the culture and history of the United States; Whereas Congress has played a central role in recognizing ‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ since the House of Representatives and Senate passed resolutions in 2005 and 2006, respectively, urging the President to proclaim the national observation of a month recognizing the Jew- ish-American community; Whereas, since 2006, Presidents Bush, Obama, Trump, and Biden have all issued proclamations for ‘‘Jewish Amer- ican Heritage Month’’, which celebrates Jewish Ameri- cans and encourages all people of the United States to learn more about Jewish heritage and the contributions of Jewish people throughout the history of the United States; Whereas, since Hamas’ deadly attack on Israel on October 7, 2023, antisemitism in the United States has reached record highs with incidents targeting Jews and those who are perceived as Jewish; Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, 77 percent of American Jews say they feel less safe as a Jewish person in the United States because of the Octo- ber 7, 2023, Hamas terrorist attacks; Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, al- most 70 percent of Jewish adults report experiencing antisemitism online, including on social media; Whereas, according to Hillel International, 83 percent of Jewish college students have experienced or witnessed some form of antisemitism since the October 7, 2023, Hamas attacks on Israel; VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 •HRES 352 IH Whereas one of the most effective ways to combat anti- semitism and hate is through education and awareness of the contributions Jewish Americans have made to the United States through the arts, entertainment, science and technology, military, government, business, culinary traditions, and other fields; Whereas there are many Jewish American inventors that have impacted the everyday lives of Americans for the better; Whereas Irving Naxon invented and patented the slow cook- er, taking inspiration from Jewish cooking traditions in Europe; Whereas Sylvan Goldman invented the shopping cart; Whereas Evelyn Berezin invented the first true word-proc- essing computer and automated airline reservation sys- tem; Whereas Ralph Baer invented the ‘‘Brown Box’’, a prototype for the first multiplayer, multiprogram video game sys- tem; Whereas Ruth Handler founded the toy company Mattel and invented the Barbie doll; Whereas Emile Berliner invented the gramophone record and the microphone that became part of the first Bell tele- phone; Whereas Edwin Land invented the Polaroid instant camera; Whereas Hedy Lamarr invented the concept of ‘‘frequency hopping’’ which made possible a wide range of wireless communications technologies, including Wi-Fi, GPS, and Bluetooth; and VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 •HRES 352 IH Whereas, to counter the rise of antisemitism, it is critical to increase awareness of Jewish-American contributions to the success of America: Now, therefore, be it: Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 (1) calls on elected officials, faith leaders, and 2 civil society leaders to condemn and counter all acts 3 of antisemitism; 4 (2) calls on the executive branch and State and 5 local leaders to educate the public on the contribu-6 tions of the Jewish-American community and uplift 7 Jewish stories and voices; and 8 (3) takes all possible steps to ensure the safety, 9 security, and dignity of American Jews in all aspects 10 of their lives, including the workplace, college and 11 university campuses, synagogues, and at home. 12 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB