1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 352 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter antisemitism |
---|
6 | 6 | | and educate the public on the contributions of the Jewish American |
---|
7 | 7 | | community. |
---|
8 | 8 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
9 | 9 | | APRIL24, 2025 |
---|
10 | 10 | | Ms. W |
---|
11 | 11 | | ASSERMANSCHULTZ(for herself, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. CARTERof |
---|
12 | 12 | | Louisiana, and Mr. F |
---|
13 | 13 | | ITZPATRICK) submitted the following resolution; |
---|
14 | 14 | | which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary |
---|
15 | 15 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
16 | 16 | | Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter |
---|
17 | 17 | | antisemitism and educate the public on the contributions |
---|
18 | 18 | | of the Jewish American community. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Whereas ‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ has its origins |
---|
20 | 20 | | in 1980, when Congress enacted a Joint Resolution enti- |
---|
21 | 21 | | tled ‘‘joint resolution to authorize and request the Presi- |
---|
22 | 22 | | dent to issue a proclamation designating April 21 |
---|
23 | 23 | | through April 28, 1980, as ‘Jewish Heritage Week’’’, ap- |
---|
24 | 24 | | proved April 24, 1980 (Public Law 96–237; 94 Stat. |
---|
25 | 25 | | 338); |
---|
26 | 26 | | Whereas, on April 24, 1980, President Carter issued the |
---|
27 | 27 | | proclamation for ‘‘Jewish Heritage Week’’, and in that |
---|
28 | 28 | | proclamation, President Carter spoke about the bountiful |
---|
29 | 29 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 |
---|
30 | 30 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | •HRES 352 IH |
---|
32 | 32 | | contributions made by the Jewish people to the culture |
---|
33 | 33 | | and history of the United States; |
---|
34 | 34 | | Whereas Congress has played a central role in recognizing |
---|
35 | 35 | | ‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ since the House of |
---|
36 | 36 | | Representatives and Senate passed resolutions in 2005 |
---|
37 | 37 | | and 2006, respectively, urging the President to proclaim |
---|
38 | 38 | | the national observation of a month recognizing the Jew- |
---|
39 | 39 | | ish-American community; |
---|
40 | 40 | | Whereas, since 2006, Presidents Bush, Obama, Trump, and |
---|
41 | 41 | | Biden have all issued proclamations for ‘‘Jewish Amer- |
---|
42 | 42 | | ican Heritage Month’’, which celebrates Jewish Ameri- |
---|
43 | 43 | | cans and encourages all people of the United States to |
---|
44 | 44 | | learn more about Jewish heritage and the contributions |
---|
45 | 45 | | of Jewish people throughout the history of the United |
---|
46 | 46 | | States; |
---|
47 | 47 | | Whereas, since Hamas’ deadly attack on Israel on October 7, |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2023, antisemitism in the United States has reached |
---|
49 | 49 | | record highs with incidents targeting Jews and those who |
---|
50 | 50 | | are perceived as Jewish; |
---|
51 | 51 | | Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, 77 |
---|
52 | 52 | | percent of American Jews say they feel less safe as a |
---|
53 | 53 | | Jewish person in the United States because of the Octo- |
---|
54 | 54 | | ber 7, 2023, Hamas terrorist attacks; |
---|
55 | 55 | | Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, al- |
---|
56 | 56 | | most 70 percent of Jewish adults report experiencing |
---|
57 | 57 | | antisemitism online, including on social media; |
---|
58 | 58 | | Whereas, according to Hillel International, 83 percent of |
---|
59 | 59 | | Jewish college students have experienced or witnessed |
---|
60 | 60 | | some form of antisemitism since the October 7, 2023, |
---|
61 | 61 | | Hamas attacks on Israel; |
---|
62 | 62 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 |
---|
63 | 63 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 |
---|
64 | 64 | | •HRES 352 IH |
---|
65 | 65 | | Whereas one of the most effective ways to combat anti- |
---|
66 | 66 | | semitism and hate is through education and awareness of |
---|
67 | 67 | | the contributions Jewish Americans have made to the |
---|
68 | 68 | | United States through the arts, entertainment, science |
---|
69 | 69 | | and technology, military, government, business, culinary |
---|
70 | 70 | | traditions, and other fields; |
---|
71 | 71 | | Whereas there are many Jewish American inventors that |
---|
72 | 72 | | have impacted the everyday lives of Americans for the |
---|
73 | 73 | | better; |
---|
74 | 74 | | Whereas Irving Naxon invented and patented the slow cook- |
---|
75 | 75 | | er, taking inspiration from Jewish cooking traditions in |
---|
76 | 76 | | Europe; |
---|
77 | 77 | | Whereas Sylvan Goldman invented the shopping cart; |
---|
78 | 78 | | Whereas Evelyn Berezin invented the first true word-proc- |
---|
79 | 79 | | essing computer and automated airline reservation sys- |
---|
80 | 80 | | tem; |
---|
81 | 81 | | Whereas Ralph Baer invented the ‘‘Brown Box’’, a prototype |
---|
82 | 82 | | for the first multiplayer, multiprogram video game sys- |
---|
83 | 83 | | tem; |
---|
84 | 84 | | Whereas Ruth Handler founded the toy company Mattel and |
---|
85 | 85 | | invented the Barbie doll; |
---|
86 | 86 | | Whereas Emile Berliner invented the gramophone record and |
---|
87 | 87 | | the microphone that became part of the first Bell tele- |
---|
88 | 88 | | phone; |
---|
89 | 89 | | Whereas Edwin Land invented the Polaroid instant camera; |
---|
90 | 90 | | Whereas Hedy Lamarr invented the concept of ‘‘frequency |
---|
91 | 91 | | hopping’’ which made possible a wide range of wireless |
---|
92 | 92 | | communications technologies, including Wi-Fi, GPS, and |
---|
93 | 93 | | Bluetooth; and |
---|
94 | 94 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 |
---|
95 | 95 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 |
---|
96 | 96 | | •HRES 352 IH |
---|
97 | 97 | | Whereas, to counter the rise of antisemitism, it is critical to |
---|
98 | 98 | | increase awareness of Jewish-American contributions to |
---|
99 | 99 | | the success of America: Now, therefore, be it: |
---|
100 | 100 | | Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1 |
---|
101 | 101 | | (1) calls on elected officials, faith leaders, and 2 |
---|
102 | 102 | | civil society leaders to condemn and counter all acts 3 |
---|
103 | 103 | | of antisemitism; 4 |
---|
104 | 104 | | (2) calls on the executive branch and State and 5 |
---|
105 | 105 | | local leaders to educate the public on the contribu-6 |
---|
106 | 106 | | tions of the Jewish-American community and uplift 7 |
---|
107 | 107 | | Jewish stories and voices; and 8 |
---|
108 | 108 | | (3) takes all possible steps to ensure the safety, 9 |
---|
109 | 109 | | security, and dignity of American Jews in all aspects 10 |
---|
110 | 110 | | of their lives, including the workplace, college and 11 |
---|
111 | 111 | | university campuses, synagogues, and at home. 12 |
---|
112 | 112 | | Æ |
---|
113 | 113 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352 |
---|
114 | 114 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|