Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR352 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/25/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 352 
Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter antisemitism 
and educate the public on the contributions of the Jewish American 
community. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL24, 2025 
Ms. W
ASSERMANSCHULTZ(for herself, Mrs. MILLER-MEEKS, Mr. CARTERof 
Louisiana, and Mr. F
ITZPATRICK) submitted the following resolution; 
which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter 
antisemitism and educate the public on the contributions 
of the Jewish American community. 
Whereas ‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ has its origins 
in 1980, when Congress enacted a Joint Resolution enti-
tled ‘‘joint resolution to authorize and request the Presi-
dent to issue a proclamation designating April 21 
through April 28, 1980, as ‘Jewish Heritage Week’’’, ap-
proved April 24, 1980 (Public Law 96–237; 94 Stat. 
338); 
Whereas, on April 24, 1980, President Carter issued the 
proclamation for ‘‘Jewish Heritage Week’’, and in that 
proclamation, President Carter spoke about the bountiful 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 352 IH 
contributions made by the Jewish people to the culture 
and history of the United States; 
Whereas Congress has played a central role in recognizing 
‘‘Jewish American Heritage Month’’ since the House of 
Representatives and Senate passed resolutions in 2005 
and 2006, respectively, urging the President to proclaim 
the national observation of a month recognizing the Jew-
ish-American community; 
Whereas, since 2006, Presidents Bush, Obama, Trump, and 
Biden have all issued proclamations for ‘‘Jewish Amer-
ican Heritage Month’’, which celebrates Jewish Ameri-
cans and encourages all people of the United States to 
learn more about Jewish heritage and the contributions 
of Jewish people throughout the history of the United 
States; 
Whereas, since Hamas’ deadly attack on Israel on October 7, 
2023, antisemitism in the United States has reached 
record highs with incidents targeting Jews and those who 
are perceived as Jewish; 
Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, 77 
percent of American Jews say they feel less safe as a 
Jewish person in the United States because of the Octo-
ber 7, 2023, Hamas terrorist attacks; 
Whereas, according to the American Jewish Committee, al-
most 70 percent of Jewish adults report experiencing 
antisemitism online, including on social media; 
Whereas, according to Hillel International, 83 percent of 
Jewish college students have experienced or witnessed 
some form of antisemitism since the October 7, 2023, 
Hamas attacks on Israel; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•HRES 352 IH 
Whereas one of the most effective ways to combat anti-
semitism and hate is through education and awareness of 
the contributions Jewish Americans have made to the 
United States through the arts, entertainment, science 
and technology, military, government, business, culinary 
traditions, and other fields; 
Whereas there are many Jewish American inventors that 
have impacted the everyday lives of Americans for the 
better; 
Whereas Irving Naxon invented and patented the slow cook-
er, taking inspiration from Jewish cooking traditions in 
Europe; 
Whereas Sylvan Goldman invented the shopping cart; 
Whereas Evelyn Berezin invented the first true word-proc-
essing computer and automated airline reservation sys-
tem; 
Whereas Ralph Baer invented the ‘‘Brown Box’’, a prototype 
for the first multiplayer, multiprogram video game sys-
tem; 
Whereas Ruth Handler founded the toy company Mattel and 
invented the Barbie doll; 
Whereas Emile Berliner invented the gramophone record and 
the microphone that became part of the first Bell tele-
phone; 
Whereas Edwin Land invented the Polaroid instant camera; 
Whereas Hedy Lamarr invented the concept of ‘‘frequency 
hopping’’ which made possible a wide range of wireless 
communications technologies, including Wi-Fi, GPS, and 
Bluetooth; and 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•HRES 352 IH 
Whereas, to counter the rise of antisemitism, it is critical to 
increase awareness of Jewish-American contributions to 
the success of America: Now, therefore, be it: 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) calls on elected officials, faith leaders, and 2
civil society leaders to condemn and counter all acts 3
of antisemitism; 4
(2) calls on the executive branch and State and 5
local leaders to educate the public on the contribu-6
tions of the Jewish-American community and uplift 7
Jewish stories and voices; and 8
(3) takes all possible steps to ensure the safety, 9
security, and dignity of American Jews in all aspects 10
of their lives, including the workplace, college and 11
university campuses, synagogues, and at home. 12
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:20 Apr 25, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR352.IH HR352
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB