Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR365 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/01/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 365 
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the House should 
recognize Robert Aitken’s Bible as a historical document of the United 
States Congress. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APRIL30, 2025 
Mr. O
GLES(for himself, Mr. CLOUD, Mr. STEUBE, and Mr. MOOREof Ala-
bama) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Com-
mittee on House Administration 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that 
the House should recognize Robert Aitken’s Bible as 
a historical document of the United States Congress. 
Whereas Robert Aitken’s Bible is the first known English- 
language Bible to be printed in North America; 
Whereas, on January 21, 1781, Robert Aitken presented a 
memorial petition to Congress offering to print an edition 
of the Holy Scriptures to be used in schools; 
Whereas, on September 12, 1782, the Committee on Con-
gress issued a resolution which approved the ‘‘pious and 
laudable undertaking of Mr. Aitken, as subservient to the 
interest of religion, as well as an instance of the progress 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:29 May 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR365.IH HR365
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 365 IH 
of arts in this country’’, and recommended this edition of 
the Bible to the inhabitants of the United States; and 
Whereas Charles Thomson, the Secretary of the Continental 
Congress, signed the resolution of the Aitken Bible issued 
on September 12, 1782: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That it is the sense of the House of Rep-1
resentatives that the House should recognize Robert 2
Aitken’s Bible as a historical document of the United 3
States Congress. 4
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:29 May 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR365.IH HR365
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS