Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR369 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/02/2025

                    IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 369 
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the Secretary 
of Health and Human Services should withdraw a reduction in public 
notice and comment opportunities. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY1, 2025 
Mrs. F
LETCHER(for herself, Mr. QUIGLEY, Mr. AMO, Mr. TONKO, Ms. 
W
ASSERMANSCHULTZ, Ms. TLAIB, Mr. BISHOP, Ms. CASTORof Florida, 
Mr. L
ANDSMAN, Ms. MATSUI, Ms. DEGETTE, Ms. MCCLELLAN, Mr. 
R
UIZ, Mr. FIELDS, Ms. VELA´ZQUEZ, Mr. MULLIN, Mr. EVANSof Penn-
sylvania, Mrs. M
CBATH, Mrs. DINGELL, and Ms. NORTON) submitted the 
following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judici-
ary 
RESOLUTION 
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that 
the Secretary of Health and Human Services should 
withdraw a reduction in public notice and comment op-
portunities. 
Whereas public participation in the regulatory process is es-
sential to the formulation of fair and sound policy; 
Whereas open rulemaking mitigates the possibility of arbi-
trary, harmful, and ill-advised rulemaking; 
Whereas the Department of Health and Human Services has 
successfully adhered to Administrative Procedure Act no-
tice and comment period procedures for 54 years; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:43 May 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR369.IH HR369
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•HRES 369 IH 
Whereas the daily lives of millions of Americans are pro-
foundly affected by the regulations that are issued by the 
Department of Health and Human Services; and 
Whereas it is critical that program beneficiaries, State and 
local governments, human services providers, and organi-
zations continue to be afforded the opportunity for input 
whenever Health and Human Services regulatory changes 
are proposed: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That it is the sense of the House of Rep-1
resentatives that the Secretary of Health and Human 2
Services should withdraw the notice published in the Fed-3
eral Register on March 3, 2025 (90 Fed. Reg. 11029) that 4
would reduce public notice and comment opportunities, 5
and affirm practices as in effect on February 27, 2025, 6
which involve the public in rulemaking procedures. 7
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:43 May 01, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR369.IH HR369
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB