Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR398 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/09/2025

                            IV 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION H. RES. 398 
Condemning Iran’s failure to comply with its international nuclear obligations. 
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
MAY8, 2025 
Mr. B
AUMGARTNERsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to 
the Committee on Foreign Affairs 
RESOLUTION 
Condemning Iran’s failure to comply with its international 
nuclear obligations. 
Whereas the International Atomic Energy Agency (IAEA) 
plays an essential role in monitoring and verifying the 
compliance of signatories to the Treaty on the Non-Pro-
liferation of Nuclear Weapons (NPT) with their safe-
guards obligations; 
Whereas the IAEA Director General and the Secretariat have 
conducted professional, independent, and impartial ef-
forts to monitor Iran’s compliance with its NPT-required 
safeguards obligations, enhanced IAEA monitoring agree-
ments, and other additional protocols; 
Whereas the IAEA has identified multiple outstanding safe-
guards issues related to Iran’s nuclear activities, includ-
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:43 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR398.IH HR398
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•HRES 398 IH 
ing the presence of undeclared nuclear material at mul-
tiple sites; 
Whereas Iran has repeatedly failed to fully cooperate with the 
IAEA despite multiple resolutions by the IAEA Board of 
Governors calling upon Iran to urgently fulfill its NPT- 
related obligations and resolve outstanding safeguards 
issues; 
Whereas Iran’s recent public statements regarding its tech-
nical capabilities to produce nuclear weapons and poten-
tial changes to its nuclear doctrine have raised further 
concerns about the true intent of Iran’s nuclear program; 
Whereas the IAEA Director General has stated that, unless 
and until Iran provides credible explanations for the pres-
ence of undeclared uranium particles and discloses the lo-
cation of missing nuclear material, the IAEA cannot con-
firm the exclusively peaceful nature of Iran’s nuclear pro-
gram; 
Whereas, on January 23, 2025, IAEA Director General 
Rafael Grossi reported that Iran has ramped up its pro-
duction of 60 percent enriched uranium from 7 kg to 
over 30 kg per month and now holds about 200 kg— 
enough to produce at least 5 nuclear weapons if further 
enriched to 90 percent; 
Whereas Iran’s actions undermine regional stability and in-
crease the risk of nuclear proliferation in the Middle 
East; 
Whereas the failure of Iran to fully comply with its nuclear 
obligations necessitates the imposition of additional diplo-
matic and economic measures to ensure its adherence to 
international norms; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:43 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\HR398.IH HR398
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•HRES 398 IH 
Whereas diplomatic measures must prioritize working with 
the United Kingdom, France, and Germany (the E3) to 
advance efforts to trigger snapback proceedings under 
United Nations Security Council Resolution 2231 before 
the mechanism expires in October 2025; 
Whereas, on January 19, 1984, the United States designated 
the Islamic Republic of Iran as a state sponsor of ter-
rorism for repeatedly providing support for acts of inter-
national terrorism; 
Whereas, on July 14, 2022, in the Jerusalem U.S.-Israel 
Strategic Partnership Joint Declaration, which was 
signed between the United States and Israel, the United 
States stressed its commitment ‘‘never to allow Iran to 
acquire a nuclear weapon, and that [the United States] 
is prepared to use all elements of its national power to 
ensure that outcome’’; 
Whereas the 118th Congress, in H. Res. 559, adopted on No-
vember 1, 2023, resolved that it is the policy of the 
United States to use all means necessary to prevent Iran 
from obtaining a nuclear weapon; and 
Whereas Congress has the exclusive responsibility to author-
ize the use of force under section 8(a)(1) of the War 
Powers Resolution: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the House of Representatives— 1
(1) supports the continued efforts of the Inter-2
national Atomic Energy Agency to verify Iran’s com-3
pliance with its Treaty on the Non-Proliferation of 4
Nuclear Weapons Safeguards Agreement; 5
(2) condemns Iran for its persistent failure to 6
cooperate with the International Atomic Energy 7
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:43 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR398.IH HR398
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 
•HRES 398 IH 
Agency and for its lack of transparency regarding its 1
nuclear program; 2
(3) calls upon Iran to immediately fulfill its ob-3
ligations under its Treaty on the Non-Proliferation 4
of Nuclear Weapons Safeguards Agreement and re-5
solve all outstanding safeguards issues; 6
(4) urges Iran to reinstate the designation of all 7
necessary International Atomic Energy Agency in-8
spectors and provide them with full and unfettered 9
access to all relevant nuclear sites; 10
(5) calls on the United States Government, in 11
coordination with international allies and partners, 12
to take all necessary diplomatic and economic meas-13
ures to hold Iran accountable for its violations of its 14
nuclear commitments; 15
(6) supports the International Atomic Energy 16
Agency Director General’s ongoing efforts to engage 17
with Iran and urges Iran to comply with its inter-18
national nuclear obligations and to end its continued 19
pursuit of nuclear weapons; and 20
(7) asserts that should international efforts fail 21
to address the nuclear threat posed by Iran, and 22
should Iran withdraw from the Treaty on the Non- 23
Proliferation of Nuclear Weapons or should the 24
United States National Intelligence Estimate con-25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:43 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR398.IH HR398
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5 
•HRES 398 IH 
clude that Iran has crossed the nuclear threshold, 1
Congress should take all necessary and appropriate 2
steps to authorize the use of the United States 3
Armed Forces against the Islamic Republic of Iran. 4
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 21:43 May 08, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR398.IH HR398
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS