1 | 1 | | IV |
---|
2 | 2 | | 119THCONGRESS |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1 |
---|
4 | 4 | | STSESSION H. RES. 84 |
---|
5 | 5 | | Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Transportation |
---|
6 | 6 | | and Infrastructure in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress. |
---|
7 | 7 | | IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
8 | 8 | | JANUARY31, 2025 |
---|
9 | 9 | | Mr. G |
---|
10 | 10 | | RAVES(for himself and Mr. LARSENof Washington) submitted the fol- |
---|
11 | 11 | | lowing resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Admin- |
---|
12 | 12 | | istration |
---|
13 | 13 | | RESOLUTION |
---|
14 | 14 | | Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on |
---|
15 | 15 | | Transportation and Infrastructure in the One Hundred |
---|
16 | 16 | | Nineteenth Congress. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Resolved, 1 |
---|
18 | 18 | | SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | For the expenses of the Committee on Transportation 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | and Infrastructure (hereafter in this resolution referred 4 |
---|
21 | 21 | | to as the ‘‘Committee’’), including the expenses of all staff 5 |
---|
22 | 22 | | salaries, there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts 6 |
---|
23 | 23 | | of the House of Representatives for committee salaries 7 |
---|
24 | 24 | | and expenses, not more than $23,290,035 for the One 8 |
---|
25 | 25 | | Hundred Nineteenth Congress. 9 |
---|
26 | 26 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:14 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR84.IH HR84 |
---|
27 | 27 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 |
---|
28 | 28 | | •HRES 84 IH |
---|
29 | 29 | | SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1 |
---|
30 | 30 | | Of the amount specified in section 1— 2 |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) not more than $11,102,513 shall be avail-3 |
---|
32 | 32 | | able for expenses incurred during the period begin-4 |
---|
33 | 33 | | ning at noon on January 3, 2025, and ending imme-5 |
---|
34 | 34 | | diately before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (2) not more than $12,187,522 shall be avail-7 |
---|
36 | 36 | | able for expenses incurred during the period begin-8 |
---|
37 | 37 | | ning at noon on January 3, 2026, and ending imme-9 |
---|
38 | 38 | | diately before noon on January 3, 2027. 10 |
---|
39 | 39 | | SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12 |
---|
41 | 41 | | vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13 |
---|
42 | 42 | | Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14 |
---|
43 | 43 | | directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15 |
---|
44 | 44 | | SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16 |
---|
45 | 45 | | Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17 |
---|
46 | 46 | | be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18 |
---|
47 | 47 | | the Committee on House Administration. 19 |
---|
48 | 48 | | Æ |
---|
49 | 49 | | VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:14 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR84.IH HR84 |
---|
50 | 50 | | kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB |
---|