Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR85 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 IV
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. RES. 85
55 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Energy and
66 Commerce in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress.
77 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88 JANUARY31, 2025
99 Mr. G
1010 UTHRIEsubmitted the following resolution; which was referred to the
1111 Committee on House Administration
1212 RESOLUTION
1313 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on
1414 Energy and Commerce in the One Hundred Nineteenth
1515 Congress.
1616 Resolved, 1
1717 SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
1818 For the expenses of the Committee on Energy and 3
1919 Commerce (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the 4
2020 ‘‘Committee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, 5
2121 there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the 6
2222 House of Representatives for committee salaries and ex-7
2323 penses, not more than $32,293,696 for the One Hundred 8
2424 Nineteenth Congress. 9
2525 VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:14 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR85.IH HR85
2626 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
2727 •HRES 85 IH
2828 SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
2929 Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
3030 (1) not more than $15,774,974 shall be avail-3
3131 able for expenses incurred during the period begin-4
3232 ning at noon on January 3, 2025, and ending imme-5
3333 diately before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
3434 (2) not more than $16,518,722 shall be avail-7
3535 able for expenses incurred during the period begin-8
3636 ning at noon on January 3, 2026, and ending imme-9
3737 diately before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
3838 SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
3939 Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
4040 vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
4141 Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
4242 directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
4343 SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
4444 Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
4545 be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
4646 the Committee on House Administration. 19
4747 Æ
4848 VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:14 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR85.IH HR85
4949 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB