Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR90 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 IV
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION H. RES. 90
55 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on Natural Resources
66 in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress.
77 IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
88 JANUARY31, 2025
99 Mr. W
1010 ESTERMAN(for himself and Mr. HUFFMAN) submitted the following
1111 resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Administration
1212 RESOLUTION
1313 Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on
1414 Natural Resources in the One Hundred Nineteenth Congress.
1515 Resolved, 1
1616 SECTION 1. AMOUNTS FOR COMMITTEE EXPENSES. 2
1717 For the expenses of the Committee on Natural Re-3
1818 sources (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the 4
1919 ‘‘Committee’’), including the expenses of all staff salaries, 5
2020 there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the 6
2121 House of Representatives for committee salaries and ex-7
2222 penses, not more than $19,311,600 for the One Hundred 8
2323 Nineteenth Congress. 9
2424 VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:16 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\HR90.IH HR90
2525 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2
2626 •HRES 90 IH
2727 SEC. 2. SESSION LIMITATIONS. 1
2828 Of the amount specified in section 1— 2
2929 (1) not more than $9,655,800 shall be available 3
3030 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 4
3131 noon on January 3, 2025, and ending immediately 5
3232 before noon on January 3, 2026; and 6
3333 (2) not more than $9,655,800 shall be available 7
3434 for expenses incurred during the period beginning at 8
3535 noon on January 3, 2026, and ending immediately 9
3636 before noon on January 3, 2027. 10
3737 SEC. 3. VOUCHERS. 11
3838 Payments under this resolution shall be made on 12
3939 vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the 13
4040 Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner 14
4141 directed by the Committee on House Administration. 15
4242 SEC. 4. REGULATIONS. 16
4343 Amounts made available under this resolution shall 17
4444 be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by 18
4545 the Committee on House Administration. 19
4646 Æ
4747 VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:16 Jan 31, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\HR90.IH HR90
4848 kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB