Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1399 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 1399
55 To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure appropriate
66 payment of certain algorithm-based healthcare services under the Medi-
77 care program.
88 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
99 APRIL9, 2025
1010 Mr. R
1111 OUNDS(for himself, Mr. HEINRICH, and Mrs. BLACKBURN) introduced
1212 the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee
1313 on Finance
1414 A BILL
1515 To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to ensure
1616 appropriate payment of certain algorithm-based
1717 healthcare services under the Medicare program.
1818 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
1919 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
2020 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
2121 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Health Tech Invest-4
2222 ment Act’’. 5
2323 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
2424 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 2
2525 •S 1399 IS
2626 SEC. 2. ENSURING APPROPRIATE PAYMENT OF CERTAIN 1
2727 ALGORITHM-BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICES 2
2828 UNDER THE MEDICARE PROGRAM. 3
2929 (a) I
3030 NGENERAL.—Section 1833(t) of the Social Se-4
3131 curity Act (42 U.S.C. 1395l(t)) is amended— 5
3232 (1) in paragraph (2)(E), by inserting ‘‘and new 6
3333 technology ambulatory payment classification of al-7
3434 gorithm-based healthcare services under paragraph 8
3535 (16)(H)’’ after ‘‘(16)(G)’’; and 9
3636 (2) in paragraph (16), by adding at the end the 10
3737 following new subparagraph: 11
3838 ‘‘(H) S
3939 PECIAL RULE FOR CERTAIN ALGO -12
4040 RITHM-BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICES .— 13
4141 ‘‘(i) I
4242 N GENERAL.—In the case of a 14
4343 covered OPD service furnished on or after 15
4444 January 1, 2026, that is an algorithm- 16
4545 based healthcare service (as defined in 17
4646 clause (ii)) that is assigned to a new tech-18
4747 nology ambulatory payment classification 19
4848 (as described in the final rule entitled 20
4949 ‘Medicare Program; Changes to the Hos-21
5050 pital Outpatient Prospective Payment Sys-22
5151 tem for Calendar Year 2002’ published by 23
5252 the Department of Health and Human 24
5353 Services on November 30, 2001 (66 Fed. 25
5454 Reg. 59897)) on or after the date of the 26
5555 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
5656 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 3
5757 •S 1399 IS
5858 enactment of this subparagraph or for 1
5959 which, as of such date, is currently and 2
6060 has been assigned to a new technology am-3
6161 bulatory payment classification for a pe-4
6262 riod of less than 5 years, the Secretary— 5
6363 ‘‘(I) shall ensure that such serv-6
6464 ice is assigned to a new technology 7
6565 ambulatory payment classification 8
6666 based on the cost of such service as 9
6767 submitted by the manufacturer of 10
6868 such service in a form and manner 11
6969 specified by the Secretary, including 12
7070 costs for the technology based on in-13
7171 voice prices, subscription-based prices, 14
7272 clinical staff, overhead, and other 15
7373 costs associated with providing the 16
7474 service; 17
7575 ‘‘(II) shall adjust the new tech-18
7676 nology ambulatory payment classifica-19
7777 tion pursuant to subclause (I) as nec-20
7878 essary; and 21
7979 ‘‘(III) may not remove such serv-22
8080 ice from the new technology ambula-23
8181 tory payment classification as deter-24
8282 mined under subclauses (I) and (II) 25
8383 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
8484 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 4
8585 •S 1399 IS
8686 until the Secretary determines that 1
8787 adequate claims data exists to reas-2
8888 sign such service to another ambula-3
8989 tory payment classification (which in 4
9090 no case may be before such service 5
9191 has received payment under the as-6
9292 signed new technology ambulatory 7
9393 payment classification for at least 5 8
9494 years). 9
9595 ‘‘(ii) A
9696 DJUSTMENT.—The Secretary 10
9797 shall adjust the application process and 11
9898 criteria for the new technology ambulatory 12
9999 payment classification to ensure that, in 13
100100 addition to currently eligible algorithm- 14
101101 based healthcare services, algorithm-based 15
102102 healthcare services that otherwise meet the 16
103103 eligibility requirements for such classifica-17
104104 tion and are distinct from but performed 18
105105 concurrently with, adjunctive to, or pro-19
106106 vided in any other modality or form as 20
107107 part of an underlying service and require 21
108108 additional resources, meet— 22
109109 ‘‘(I) the eligibility requirement 23
110110 that they are distinct new procedures 24
111111 with a beginning, middle, and end; or 25
112112 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
113113 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 5
114114 •S 1399 IS
115115 ‘‘(II) any subsequent similar new 1
116116 technology ambulatory payment classi-2
117117 fication eligibility requirement. 3
118118 ‘‘(iii) D
119119 EFINITION OF ALGORITHM - 4
120120 BASED HEALTHCARE SERVICE .—For pur-5
121121 poses of this subparagraph, the term ‘algo-6
122122 rithm-based healthcare service’ means a 7
123123 service delivered through a device cleared 8
124124 or approved by the Food and Drug Admin-9
125125 istration that uses artificial intelligence, 10
126126 machine learning, or other similarly de-11
127127 signed software to yield clinical outputs or 12
128128 generate clinical conclusions for use by a 13
129129 physician or practitioner in the screening, 14
130130 detection, diagnosis, or treatment of an in-15
131131 dividual’s condition or disease, or any such 16
132132 other similar service as the Secretary de-17
133133 termines appropriate in consultation with 18
134134 appropriate organizations.’’. 19
135135 (b) C
136136 ODIFYINGOPPS PAYMENT FORSOFTWARE AS 20
137137 ASERVICE.—Effective for services provided on or after 21
138138 January 1, 2023, the Secretary of Health and Human 22
139139 Services shall apply the hospital outpatient prospective 23
140140 payment system payment for software as a service policy 24
141141 described in the final rule entitled, ‘‘Medicare Program: 25
142142 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
143143 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 6
144144 •S 1399 IS
145145 Hospital Outpatient Prospective Payment and Ambulatory 1
146146 Surgical Center Payment Systems and Quality Reporting 2
147147 Programs; Organ Acquisition; Rural Emergency Hos-3
148148 pitals: Payment Policies, Conditions of Participation, Pro-4
149149 vider Enrollment, Physician Self-Referral; New Service 5
150150 Category for Hospital Outpatient Department Prior Au-6
151151 thorization Process; Overall Hospital Quality Star Rating; 7
152152 COVID–19’’ published by the Department of Health and 8
153153 Human Services on November 23, 2022 (87 Fed. Reg. 9
154154 71748). 10
155155 Æ
156156 VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:46 Apr 22, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1399.IS S1399
157157 mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB