Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB1568 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/13/2025

                            II 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 1568 
To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to modify standards 
for general service lamps, and for other purposes. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MAY1, 2025 
Mr. L
EE(for himself, Mr. JUSTICE, Mr. COTTON, Mr. SCHMITT, Mr. CURTIS, 
and Mr. H
AGERTY) introduced the following bill; which was read twice 
and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources 
A BILL 
To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to modify 
standards for general service lamps, and for other purposes. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Liberating Incandes-4
cent Technology Act of 2025’’ or the ‘‘LIT Act of 2025’’. 5
SEC. 2. GENERAL SERVICES LAMPS. 6
(a) C
OVEREDPRODUCTS.— 7
(1) I
N GENERAL.—Section 322(a) of the En-8
ergy Policy and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 9
6292(a)) is amended— 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 1568 IS
(A) by striking paragraph (14); and 1
(B) by redesignating paragraphs (15) 2
through (20) as paragraphs (14) through (19), 3
respectively. 4
(2) C
ONFORMING AMENDMENTS .— 5
(A) Section 321(6)(B) of the Energy Pol-6
icy and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 7
6291(6)(B)) is amended by striking ‘‘(15), 8
(16), (17), and (20)’’ and inserting ‘‘(14), (15), 9
(16), and (19)’’. 10
(B) Section 324 of the Energy Policy and 11
Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6294) is amend-12
ed— 13
(i) in subsection (a)(2)(C)(i), by strik-14
ing ‘‘322(a)(19)’’ and inserting 15
‘‘322(a)(18)’’; 16
(ii) in subsection (b)(1)(B), by strik-17
ing ‘‘(13), and paragraphs (15) through 18
(20)’’ and inserting ‘‘(19)’’; and 19
(iii) in subsection (c)— 20
(I) in paragraph (7)— 21
(aa) by striking ‘‘product’’ 22
and inserting ‘‘products’’; and 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•S 1568 IS
(bb) by striking ‘‘(17), and 1
(18)’’ and inserting ‘‘and (17)’’; 2
and 3
(II) in paragraph (8), in the mat-4
ter preceding subparagraph (A), by 5
striking ‘‘(15) or (17)’’ and inserting 6
‘‘(14) or (16)’’. 7
(C) Section 325(n)(1) of the Energy Policy 8
and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6295(n)(1)) is 9
amended by striking ‘‘(11), and in paragraphs 10
(13) and (14)’’ and inserting ‘‘(11) and (13)’’. 11
(b) S
TANDARDS.— 12
(1) I
N GENERAL.—Section 325 of the Energy 13
Policy and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6295) is 14
amended— 15
(A) by striking subsection (i) and inserting 16
the following: 17
‘‘(i) R
ESERVED.—’’; and 18
(B) in subsection (l), by striking para-19
graph (4). 20
(2) C
ONFORMING AMENDMENTS .— 21
(A) Section 323(b) of the Energy Policy 22
and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6293(b)) is 23
amended— 24
(i) by striking paragraph (6); and 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•S 1568 IS
(ii) by redesignating paragraphs (7) 1
through (18) as paragraphs (6) through 2
(17), respectively. 3
(B) Section 324(a)(2)(D) of the Energy 4
Policy and Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 5
6294(a)(2)(D)) is amended— 6
(i) in clause (i), in the second sen-7
tence, by striking ‘‘Except as provided in 8
clause (ii), such rules’’ and inserting ‘‘Such 9
rules’’; 10
(ii) by striking clause (ii); 11
(iii) by redesignating clause (iii) as 12
clause (ii); and 13
(iv) in subclause (II) of clause (ii) (as 14
so redesignated)— 15
(I) in item (aa), by striking ‘‘; 16
and’’ and inserting a period; 17
(II) by striking item (bb); and 18
(III) in the matter preceding 19
item (aa), by striking ‘‘shall—’’ and 20
all that follows through ‘‘complete’’ in 21
item (aa) and inserting ‘‘shall com-22
plete’’. 23
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•S 1568 IS
(C) Section 327 of the Energy Policy and 1
Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6297) is amend-2
ed— 3
(i) in subsection (b)— 4
(I) in paragraph (1)(B), by strik-5
ing ‘‘2007’’ in the matter preceding 6
clause (i) and all that follows through 7
the period at the end of clause (ii) 8
and inserting ‘‘2007;’’; and 9
(II) in paragraph (4), by striking 10
‘‘or is a regulation (or portion there-11
of) regulating fluorescent or incandes-12
cent lamps other than those to which 13
section 325(i) is applicable,’’; and 14
(ii) in subsection (c)(1), by striking ‘‘, 15
except that’’ and all that follows through 16
‘‘such lamps’’. 17
(D) Section 334 of the Energy Policy and 18
Conservation Act (42 U.S.C. 6304) is amended 19
in the second sentence by striking ‘‘a general 20
service incandescent lamp that does not comply 21
with the applicable standard established under 22
section 325(i) or’’. 23
(c) T
ERMINATION OF RULES.—The following rules 24
shall have no force or effect: 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB 6 
•S 1568 IS
(1) The rule of the Department of Energy enti-1
tled ‘‘Energy Conservation Program: Energy Con-2
servation Standards for General Services Lamps’’ 3
(87 Fed. Reg. 27439 (May 9, 2022)). 4
(2) The rule of the Department of Energy enti-5
tled ‘‘Energy Conservation Program: Definitions for 6
General Service Lamps’’ (87 Fed. Reg. 27461 (May 7
9, 2022)). 8
(3) The rule of the Department of Energy enti-9
tled ‘‘Energy Conservation Program: Energy Con-10
servation Standards for General Services Lamps’’ 11
(89 Fed. Reg. 28856 (April 19, 2024)). 12
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 09:04 May 09, 2025 Jkt 000000 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S1568.IS S1568
mprince on LAP1J3WLY3PROD with $$_JOB