Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB496 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 II
22 119THCONGRESS
33 1
44 STSESSION S. 496
55 To exclude certain amounts relating to compensating victims of the Texas
66 Panhandle fires, and for other purposes.
77 IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
88 FEBRUARY10, 2025
99 Mr. C
1010 RUZintroduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to
1111 the Committee on Finance
1212 A BILL
1313 To exclude certain amounts relating to compensating victims
1414 of the Texas Panhandle fires, and for other purposes.
1515 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
1616 tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
1717 SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
1818 This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Wildfire Victim Tax 4
1919 Relief and Recovery Act’’. 5
2020 SEC. 2. TEXAS PANHANDLE FIRE DISASTER RELIEF PAY-6
2121 MENTS. 7
2222 (a) I
2323 NGENERAL.—Texas Panhandle fire payments 8
2424 shall be treated as qualified disaster relief payments for 9
2525 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:17 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S496.IS S496
2626 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2
2727 •S 496 IS
2828 purposes of section 139(b) of the Internal Revenue Code 1
2929 of 1986. 2
3030 (b) T
3131 EXASPANHANDLEFIREPAYMENTS.—For pur-3
3232 poses of this section, the term ‘‘Texas Panhandle fire pay-4
3333 ment’’ means any amount received by or on behalf of an 5
3434 individual as compensation for loss, damages, expenses, 6
3535 loss in real property value, closing costs with respect to 7
3636 real property (including realtor commissions), or inconven-8
3737 ience (including access to real property) resulting from 9
3838 any Texas Panhandle fire if such amount was provided 10
3939 by— 11
4040 (1) a Federal, State, or local government agen-12
4141 cy, 13
4242 (2) Xcel Energy, or 14
4343 (3) any subsidiary, insurer, or agent of Xcel 15
4444 Energy or any related person. 16
4545 (c) T
4646 EXASPANHANDLEFIRE.—For purposes of this 17
4747 section, the term ‘‘Texas Panhandle fire’’ means any of 18
4848 the following wildfires: 19
4949 (1) The Smokehouse Creek Fire that ignited in 20
5050 Hutchinson County, Texas, on February 26, 2024. 21
5151 (2) The Windy Deuce Fire that ignited in 22
5252 Moore County, Texas, on February 26, 2024. 23
5353 (3) The Grape Vine Creek Fire that ignited in 24
5454 Gray County, Texas, on February 26, 2024. 25
5555 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:17 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S496.IS S496
5656 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3
5757 •S 496 IS
5858 (4) The 687 Reamer Fire that ignited in 1
5959 Hutchinson County, Texas, on February 27, 2024. 2
6060 (5) The Roughneck Fire that ignited in Hutch-3
6161 inson County, Texas, on March 3, 2024. 4
6262 (d) E
6363 FFECTIVEDATE.—This section shall apply to 5
6464 amounts received on or after February 26, 2024. 6
6565 SEC. 3. INVOLUNTARY CONVERSIONS OF LIVESTOCK. 7
6666 (a) L
6767 IVESTOCKSOLD ONACCOUNT OFFIRE.— 8
6868 (1) I
6969 N GENERAL.—Section 1033(e)(1) of the 9
7070 Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by in-10
7171 serting ‘‘fire,’’ after ‘‘flood,’’. 11
7272 (2) E
7373 XTENSION OF REPLACEMENT PERIOD .— 12
7474 Section 1033(e)(2) of such Code is amended by in-13
7575 serting ‘‘fire,’’ after ‘‘flood,’’. 14
7676 (3) C
7777 ONFORMING AMENDMENT .—The heading 15
7878 for section 1033(e) of such Code is amended by in-16
7979 serting ‘‘F
8080 IRE,’’ after ‘‘FLOOD,’’. 17
8181 (b) R
8282 EPLACEMENT OF LIVESTOCKWITHOTHER 18
8383 P
8484 ROPERTY.—Section 1033(f) of the Internal Revenue 19
8585 Code of 1986 is amended by inserting ‘‘fire,’’ after 20
8686 ‘‘flood,’’. 21
8787 (c) E
8888 FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 22
8989 this section shall apply to taxable years beginning after 23
9090 December 31, 2023. 24
9191 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:17 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S496.IS S496
9292 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4
9393 •S 496 IS
9494 SEC. 4. PROCEEDS FROM LIVESTOCK SOLD ON ACCOUNT 1
9595 OF FIRE. 2
9696 (a) I
9797 NGENERAL.—Section 451(g) of the Internal 3
9898 Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by inserting ‘‘fire,’’ 4
9999 after ‘‘flood’’. 5
100100 (b) C
101101 ONFORMINGAMENDMENT.—The heading for 6
102102 section 451(g) of such Code is amended by inserting 7
103103 ‘‘F
104104 IRE,’’ after ‘‘FLOOD,’’. 8
105105 (c) E
106106 FFECTIVEDATE.—The amendments made by 9
107107 this section shall apply to taxable years beginning after 10
108108 December 31, 2023. 11
109109 Æ
110110 VerDate Sep 11 2014 00:17 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S496.IS S496
111111 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS