Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB505 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2025

                            II 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 505 
To amend title 31, United States Code, to modify the deadline for filing 
beneficial ownership information reports for reporting companies formed 
or registered before January 1, 2024. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY11, 2025 
Mr. S
COTTof South Carolina (for himself, Mr. ROUNDS, Mr. MORAN, Mr. 
H
AGERTY, Mr. RICKETTS, Mr. LANKFORD, Mr. CRAMER, Ms. LUMMIS, 
Mrs. B
RITT, Mr. TILLIS, and Mr. BANKS) introduced the following bill; 
which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Hous-
ing, and Urban Affairs 
A BILL 
To amend title 31, United States Code, to modify the dead-
line for filing beneficial ownership information reports 
for reporting companies formed or registered before Jan-
uary 1, 2024. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘‘Protect Small Busi-4
nesses from Excessive Paperwork Act of 2025’’. 5
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:51 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S505.IS S505
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•S 505 IS
SEC. 2. MODIFICATION OF FILING DEADLINE FOR CERTAIN 1
PRE-EXISTING REPORTING COMPANIES. 2
Section 5336(b)(1)(B) of title 31, United States 3
Code, is amended by striking ‘‘before the effective date’’ 4
and all that follows through ‘‘under this subsection’’ and 5
inserting ‘‘before January 1, 2024, shall, not later than 6
January 1, 2026’’. 7
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 04:51 Mar 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S505.IS S505
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB